|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1948 | 27/08/1948 | 52 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60517 |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1950 | 23/02/1950 | 52 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1950 | 14/09/1950 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1951 | 04/09/1951 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29785 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1952 | 03/07/1952 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1952 | 14/11/1952 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1953 | 18/09/1953 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29791 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1954 | 13/05/1954 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/06/1955 | 29/07/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29778 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1957 | 11/04/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29791 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1958 | 02/01/1959 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 29778 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1960 | 28/07/1960 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/10/1960 | 02/12/1960 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29853 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1961 | 02/09/1961 | 48 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1962 | 14/03/1962 | 17 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1947 | General | The 'Pacifics' of Thompson's design, Nos. 500 and 511-520, which were formerly designated 'A.2' Class, were towards the end of April re-classified 'A.2/3': this series will end with No. 524. The Doncaster No. of 520 Owen Tudor is 2010, and of 521 (completed early in May) 2011. As No. 500 carries works No. 2000, and 3167 is presumably Doncaster No. 2001, Nos. 511-520 were expected to appear as Nos. 2002-2011; No. 515 Sun Stream is 2006/1946. | SLS/194708 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Ex Wks.) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
10/03/1963 | Goole MPD (Stored in Works Yards) | Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. | SLS/196304 |
23/04/1963 | Doncaster Works (Stored in Works Yards) | New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/11/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 517, name: OCEAN SWELL Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2008 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 117 boiler fitted |
||
07/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1948. Dep: 27/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60517 |
||
03/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1950. Dep: 23/02/1950. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
23/02/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
18/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/08/1950. Dep: 14/09/1950. | ||
30/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1951. Dep: 04/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29785 (Diagram 117) |
||
04/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/06/1952. Dep: 03/07/1952. | ||
03/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/11/1952. Dep: 14/11/1952. | ||
11/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1953. Dep: 18/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29791 (Diagram 117) |
||
15/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/04/1954. Dep: 13/05/1954. | ||
28/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1955. Dep: 29/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29778 (Diagram 117) |
||
07/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1957. Dep: 11/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29791 (Diagram 117) |
||
14/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1958. Dep: 02/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29778 (Diagram 117) |
||
25/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/07/1960. Dep: 28/07/1960. | ||
31/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1960. Dep: 02/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29853 (Diagram 118) |
||
17/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/07/1961. Dep: 02/09/1961. | ||
01/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
26/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/02/1962. Dep: 14/03/1962. | ||
12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60517 from Tweedmouth (52D) |