|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1947 | 09/01/1947 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1947 | 18/01/1947 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1947 | 22/08/1947 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1947 | 08/09/1947 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1947 | 22/09/1947 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1948 | 15/07/1948 | 44 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60518 |
||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1948 | 28/07/1948 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/12/1949 | 01/02/1950 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1950 | 15/02/1950 | 10 days | Unclassified | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1950 | 18/01/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1951 | 23/02/1951 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1951 | 15/08/1951 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1951 | 07/09/1951 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1951 | 01/10/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1952 | 02/10/1952 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29790 (Diagram 117) |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/04/1953 | 13/04/1953 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1954 | 09/02/1954 | 30 days | General | Lipped chimney Boiler number 29787 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/03/1955 | 06/05/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29779 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1955 | 29/11/1955 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/09/1956 | 05/10/1956 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1957 | 15/11/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 10592 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1958 | 23/08/1958 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1959 | 28/05/1959 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29830 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1961 | 08/02/1961 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29820 (Diagram 118) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | General | No. 10000, after a general overhaul at Doncaster, is now again painted blue with chromium lettering and figures. 'A.2' No. 518, Tehran, was almost ready at Christmas, and No. 519 will be a 1947 engine. It is reported - that 'V.2' No. 813 KX (late 4784) has been fitted with a stovepipe chimney surrounded by semi-circular smoke deflectors. | SLS/194702 |
31/01/1947 | General | Names for 'A.2' Class: 518 Tehran, 519 Honeyway, 520 Owen. Tudor, 521 Watling Street, and probably Straight Deal, Sun Castle, Herring Bone, Sugar Palm and Sun Chariot on 522-526. No. 525 will be Mr. Peppercorn's first 'A.2/3.' | SLS/194704 |
30/06/1947 | General | The 'Pacifics' of Thompson's design, Nos. 500 and 511-520, which were formerly designated 'A.2' Class, were towards the end of April re-classified 'A.2/3': this series will end with No. 524. The Doncaster No. of 520 Owen Tudor is 2010, and of 521 (completed early in May) 2011. As No. 500 carries works No. 2000, and 3167 is presumably Doncaster No. 2001, Nos. 511-520 were expected to appear as Nos. 2002-2011; No. 515 Sun Stream is 2006/1946. | SLS/194708 |
26/06/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works on 26/6 included; Nos. 1, 29, 30/6/9, 65/7, 104, 518, 818/83, 1083, 1128, 1800/24, 2821, 60042/49/97, 60515, 60870, 61830. The first of the new 'A.1' 4-6-2's No. 60114, was nearing completion here in early July and was being proceeded with faster than No. 60539. | SLS/194808 |
10/03/1963 | Goole MPD (Stored) | Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. | SLS/196304 |
23/04/1963 | Doncaster Works (Stored) | New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/12/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 518, name: TEHRAN Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2009 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 117 boiler fitted |
||
03/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/01/1947. Dep: 09/01/1947. | ||
14/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/01/1947. Dep: 18/01/1947. | ||
22/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 22/08/1947. Dep: 22/08/1947. | ||
08/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 08/09/1947. Dep: 08/09/1947. | ||
22/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 22/09/1947. Dep: 22/09/1947. | ||
02/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1948. Dep: 15/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60518 |
||
28/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 28/07/1948. Dep: 28/07/1948. | ||
20/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1949. Dep: 01/02/1950. | ||
06/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/02/1950. Dep: 15/02/1950. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
15/02/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
19/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/12/1950. Dep: 18/01/1951. | ||
08/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/02/1951. Dep: 23/02/1951. | ||
11/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/07/1951. Dep: 15/08/1951. | ||
31/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/08/1951. Dep: 07/09/1951. | ||
29/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1951. Dep: 01/10/1951. | ||
25/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1952. Dep: 02/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29790 (Diagram 117) |
||
02/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/04/1953. Dep: 13/04/1953. | ||
11/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1954. Dep: 09/02/1954. Work undertaken: Lipped chimney Boiler number 29787 (Diagram 117) |
||
31/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1955. Dep: 06/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29779 (Diagram 117) |
||
12/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/11/1955. Dep: 29/11/1955. | ||
06/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/09/1956. Dep: 05/10/1956. | ||
08/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1957. Dep: 15/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10592 (Diagram 118) |
||
14/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/08/1958. Dep: 23/08/1958. | ||
25/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1959. Dep: 28/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29830 (Diagram 118) |
||
25/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
03/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1961. Dep: 08/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29820 (Diagram 118) |
||
12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60518 from York (North) (50A) |