|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1947 | 02/08/1947 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1947 | 29/08/1947 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1947 | 21/10/1947 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1948 | 12/04/1948 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1948 | 13/08/1948 | 39 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60520 |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1950 | 23/06/1950 | 43 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/02/1951 | 12/02/1951 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1952 | 21/03/1952 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29787 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1954 | 02/02/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29789 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1955 | 26/11/1955 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29786 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1956 | 06/04/1956 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1956 | 13/10/1956 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1957 | 23/02/1957 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29852 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1958 | 17/01/1959 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29873 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1960 | 27/04/1960 | 78 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1961 | 18/05/1961 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 29884 (Diagram 118) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1947 | General | The 'Pacifics' of Thompson's design, Nos. 500 and 511-520, which were formerly designated 'A.2' Class, were towards the end of April re-classified 'A.2/3': this series will end with No. 524. The Doncaster No. of 520 Owen Tudor is 2010, and of 521 (completed early in May) 2011. As No. 500 carries works No. 2000, and 3167 is presumably Doncaster No. 2001, Nos. 511-520 were expected to appear as Nos. 2002-2011; No. 515 Sun Stream is 2006/1946. | SLS/194708 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop-60162 (64B), 60003 (34A), 60035 (64B), 60017 (34A), 60145 (52A), 60103 (34A), 62030 (52C), 73000 (41B), 73155 (41C), 61122 (36A), 61971 (32A), 61889 (31B), 61820 (30F), 61890 (31B), 68987 (34B), 61162 (36A), 61846 (53A), 61409 (40B), 60001 (52A), 61158 (36A), 60526/502 (50A), 60039 (34A), 60152 (64B), 60026 (34A), 60520 (34F). Paint Shop-D3321 (52B), D3148 (51L), D5308 (34B), D6101/2 (34B), 60117 (56C), 61925 (36A), 60160 (64B), 62032 (31B). Yard-70030 (32A), 68914 (56B), 73016 (41C), 63940 (34F), D3079 (53A), 60508 (34E), 11182 (40A), 63975 (36A), 60063 (34F), 60095 (12C), 61816 (31B), 61406 (40B). Diesel Shop-E5001/2 motors in, D2050/1 motors in, 11106 (51C), 13147/51 (51L). Withdrawn-64216/7, 61606/48/22, 69493, 67397, 69544, 64201/74/6, 69551, 69593, 64205/49, 64183. | SLS/195902 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/03/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 520, name: OWEN TUDOR Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2011 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 117 boiler fitted |
||
17/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/07/1947. Dep: 02/08/1947. | ||
18/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/08/1947. Dep: 29/08/1947. | ||
08/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/10/1947. Dep: 21/10/1947. | ||
12/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 12/04/1948. Dep: 12/04/1948. | ||
06/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1948. Dep: 13/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60520 |
||
12/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
12/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1950. Dep: 23/06/1950. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
23/06/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
12/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 12/02/1951. Dep: 12/02/1951. | ||
18/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1952. Dep: 21/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29787 (Diagram 117) |
||
04/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1954. Dep: 02/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29789 (Diagram 117) |
||
18/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1955. Dep: 26/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29786 (Diagram 117) |
||
24/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1956. Dep: 06/04/1956. | ||
08/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/10/1956. Dep: 13/10/1956. | ||
14/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1957. Dep: 23/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29852 (Diagram 118) |
||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
09/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1958. Dep: 17/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29873 (Diagram 118) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
10/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
10/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/02/1960. Dep: 27/04/1960. | ||
29/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1961. Dep: 18/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29884 (Diagram 118) |
||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
16/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60520 from New England (34E) |