Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 743 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2858 Week
» 25364 Month
» 328554 Year
» 1550119 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 524 on 26/09/1947
British Railways 60524   26/01/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
26/09/1947 HERRINGBONE

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 11/04/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class A2
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 379
Works Number 2015
To Service Mon 26/09/1947 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 15/02/1965 off Polmadie (66A)
Scrapping Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 17 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap 5/65 to Motherwell Machinery & Scrap Co

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) on 26/09/1947
NEV Neville Hill on 18/01/1948
YK York (North) on 26/09/1948
64A St Margarets on 02/12/1962
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill on 31/12/1962
66A Polmadie on 15/09/1963
   Withdrawn on 15/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region w/e 08/12/1962
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 7w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 5w/e 12/10/1963
WDN   on 15/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
26/09/1947 Diagram 117 boiler fitted (number 3742)
26/01/1949 Diagram 117 boiler fitted (number 3713)
11/04/1951 Diagram 117 boiler fitted (number 29781)
14/09/1954 Diagram 117 boiler fitted (number 29782)
11/07/1956 Diagram 118 boiler fitted (number 29853)
09/07/1958 Diagram 117 boiler fitted (number 29781)
21/05/1960 Diagram 117 boiler fitted (number 29791)
08/11/1962 Diagram 118 boiler fitted (number 29832)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 22/12/1948 26/01/1949 36 days General
Boiler number 3713 (Diagram 117)
Renumbered to BR 60524
 
Doncaster Works 09/03/1949 06/04/1949 29 days Heavy Casual  
Doncaster Works 06/03/1951 11/04/1951 37 days General
Boiler number 29781 (Diagram 117)
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
 
Doncaster Works 01/08/1951 08/08/1951 8 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 01/10/1951 09/10/1951 9 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 15/12/1952 16/01/1953 33 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 09/03/1954 06/04/1954 29 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 06/08/1954 14/09/1954 40 days General
Boiler number 29782 (Diagram 117)
 
Doncaster Works 24/05/1956 10/07/1956 48 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/08/1956 14/08/1956 7 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 29/05/1958 09/07/1958 42 days General
Boiler number 29781 (Diagram 117)
 
Doncaster Works 13/04/1960 21/05/1960 39 days General
Boiler number 29791 (Diagram 117)
 
Doncaster Works 12/09/1960 06/10/1960 25 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 21/09/1962 08/11/1962 49 days General
Boiler number 29832 (Diagram 118)
 
Doncaster Works 13/11/1962 20/11/1962 8 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1949 Doncaster Works Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. SLS/194903

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/09/1947 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 524, name: HERRINGBONE
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2015
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 117 boiler fitted
   
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
26/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
22/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1948. Dep: 26/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3713 (Diagram 117)
Renumbered to BR 60524
   
09/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/03/1949. Dep: 06/04/1949.    
06/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1951. Dep: 11/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29781 (Diagram 117)
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
   
11/04/1951 Livery Change of livery to Brunswick green with orange and black lining.    
01/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/08/1951. Dep: 08/08/1951.    
01/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1951. Dep: 09/10/1951.    
15/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/12/1952. Dep: 16/01/1953.    
09/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/03/1954. Dep: 06/04/1954.    
06/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1954. Dep: 14/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29782 (Diagram 117)
   
24/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1956. Dep: 10/07/1956.    
11/07/1956 Modification Diagram 118 number 29853 boiler fitted    
11/07/1956 Modification Diagram 118 number 9654 boiler fitted    
08/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/08/1956. Dep: 14/08/1956.    
29/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1958. Dep: 09/07/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29781 (Diagram 117)
   
13/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1960. Dep: 21/05/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29791 (Diagram 117)
   
12/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/09/1960. Dep: 06/10/1960.    
21/09/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1962. Dep: 08/11/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29832 (Diagram 118)
   
13/11/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1962. Dep: 20/11/1962.    
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
31/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
15/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
15/02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 60524 from Polmadie (66A)    

prev prev