Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 9 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2870 Week
» 21652 Month
» 269945 Year
» 1154326 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1943) 8305   22/12/1943
LNER (1946) 1004   24/03/1946
BR 61004   02/10/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
22/12/1943 ORYX

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1922
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sat 22/12/1943 to Darlington (DAR)
Withdrawal Sat 28/12/1963 off Canklow (41D)
Scrapping Sat 21/03/1964 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 20 yrs , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 21/3/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DAR Darlington (New) 22/12/1943
STR Stratford 14/01/1944
NOR Norwich Thorpe 02/11/1945
CAM Cambridge 24/07/1946
PKS Parkeston Quay 24/01/1947
STR Stratford 31/05/1947
PKS Parkeston Quay 07/09/1947
30A Stratford 02/03/1958
30F Parkeston Quay 13/04/1958
30A Stratford 14/12/1958
30F Parkeston Quay 08/02/1959
31B March 13/12/1959
41A Sheffield Darnall 10/01/1960
41F Mexborough 09/09/1962
41D Canklow 09/12/1962
   Withdrawn 28/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay 24/01/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford 31/05/1947
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay w/e 13/09/1947
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 28/03/1958
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 41D Canklow 2w/e 15/12/1962
WDN   28/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
22/12/1943 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 3419)
18/06/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5099)
18/06/1947 Front end heater connection fitted
29/04/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5062)
22/11/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28578)
20/04/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28202)
21/09/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28256)
16/10/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28173)
16/10/1959 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Stratford Works 04/04/1944 05/04/1944 2 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 19/09/1945 20/10/1945 32 days General  
Stratford Works 10/03/1947 13/03/1947 4 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 23/04/1947 18/06/1947 57 days General
Boiler number 5099 (Diagram 100A)
Front end heater connection fitted
 
Stratford Works 17/08/1948 02/10/1948 47 days Heavy
Renumbered to BR 61004
 
Stratford Works 13/02/1950 29/04/1950 76 days General
Boiler number 5062 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 09/10/1952 22/11/1952 45 days General
Boiler number 28578 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 11/03/1955 20/04/1955 41 days General
Boiler number 28202 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 06/05/1957 09/05/1957 4 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 06/08/1957 21/09/1957 47 days General
Boiler number 28256 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 24/08/1959 16/10/1959 54 days General
Boiler number 28173 (Diagram 100A)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Stratford Works 28/10/1959 06/11/1959 10 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/12/1943 To Service To service as LNER Number 8305, name: ORYX
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1922
Allocated to Darlington (DAR)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
14/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
04/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/04/1944. Dep: 05/04/1944.    
19/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945.    
02/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1004    
24/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
24/01/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
10/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/03/1947. Dep: 13/03/1947.    
23/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1947. Dep: 18/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5099 (Diagram 100A)
Front end heater connection fitted
   
31/05/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
07/09/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
17/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/08/1948. Dep: 02/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61004
   
13/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1950. Dep: 29/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5062 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1952. Dep: 22/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28578 (Diagram 100A)
   
11/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1955. Dep: 20/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28202 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1957. Dep: 09/05/1957.    
06/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1957. Dep: 21/09/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28256 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
13/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
14/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
24/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1959. Dep: 16/10/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28173 (Diagram 100A)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
28/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/10/1959. Dep: 06/11/1959.    
13/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
10/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
09/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
09/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
28/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 61004 from Canklow (41D)    
21/03/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev