Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 9 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2870 Week
» 21652 Month
» 269945 Year
» 1154326 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1943) 8306   19/02/1944
LNER (1946) 1005   24/02/1946
BR 61005   17/03/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
19/02/1944 BONGO

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1925
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 19/02/1944 to Darlington (DAR)
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962 off March (31B)
Scrapping Wed 21/11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 18 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 21/11/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DAR Darlington (New) 19/02/1944
STR Stratford 24/03/1944
CAM Cambridge 03/02/1946
STR Stratford 24/07/1946
PKS Parkeston Quay 19/10/1946
STR Stratford 07/12/1946
PKS Parkeston Quay 25/01/1947
35A New England 07/10/1956
35C Spital Bridge 03/02/1957
30A Stratford 16/06/1957
30F Parkeston Quay 08/02/1959
31B March 01/11/1959
31A Cambridge 11/06/1961
30A Stratford 17/06/1962
31B March 29/07/1962
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge m/e 28/02/1946
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay w/e 19/10/1946
ALLOC STR Stratford 07/12/1946
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay 25/01/1947
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 30A Stratford 2w/e 23/06/1962
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 11/08/1962
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/05/1947 Front end heater connection fitted
01/05/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 3415)
11/02/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5074)
04/07/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28588)
07/04/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28524)
28/12/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28502)
11/06/1959 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
24/02/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28319)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Stratford Works 05/09/1945 22/09/1945 18 days General  
Stratford Works 13/05/1946 06/06/1946 25 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 11/03/1947 01/05/1947 52 days General
Boiler number 28578 (Diagram 100A)
Front end heater connection fitted
 
Stratford Works 14/02/1949 17/03/1949 32 days Heavy Casual
Renumbered to BR 61005
 
Stratford Works 19/12/1949 11/02/1950 55 days General
Boiler number 5074 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 26/05/1952 04/07/1952 40 days General
Boiler number 28588 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 03/11/1954 19/11/1954 17 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 28/02/1955 07/04/1955 39 days General
Boiler number 28524 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 17/07/1956 28/07/1956 12 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 25/02/1957 02/03/1957 6 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 19/11/1957 28/12/1957 40 days General
Boiler number 28502 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 05/05/1958 16/05/1958 12 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 22/05/1959 11/06/1959 21 days Light Casual
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 22/01/1960 24/02/1960 34 days General
Boiler number 28319 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/02/1944 To Service To service as LNER Number 8306, name: BONGO
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1925
Allocated to Darlington (DAR)
   
24/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
05/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1945. Dep: 22/09/1945.    
03/02/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
24/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1005    
13/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/05/1946. Dep: 06/06/1946.    
24/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
19/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
07/12/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
25/01/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
11/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1947. Dep: 01/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28578 (Diagram 100A)
Front end heater connection fitted
   
14/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1949. Dep: 17/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61005
   
19/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1949. Dep: 11/02/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5074 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1952. Dep: 04/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28588 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1954. Dep: 19/11/1954.    
28/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1955. Dep: 07/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28524 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/07/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/07/1956. Dep: 28/07/1956.    
07/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
03/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
25/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/02/1957. Dep: 02/03/1957.    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1957. Dep: 28/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28502 (Diagram 100A)
   
05/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/05/1958. Dep: 16/05/1958.    
08/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
22/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/05/1959. Dep: 11/06/1959.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
01/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1960. Dep: 24/02/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28319 (Diagram 100A)
   
11/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
17/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
29/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61005 from March (31B)    
21/11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev