|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 11/03/1948 | 23/04/1948 | 44 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61011 |
||
Gateshead Works | 18/01/1949 | 01/02/1949 | 15 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1949 | 06/07/1949 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 9728 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 08/08/1950 | 15/08/1950 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1951 | 24/02/1951 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28133 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/05/1952 | 30/05/1952 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1952 | 06/09/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28266 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1952 | 10/09/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1954 | 10/04/1954 | 24 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/07/1955 | 09/08/1955 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1956 | 23/03/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28102 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1958 | 10/04/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28191 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1960 | 14/04/1960 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1960 | 15/10/1960 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28508 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. | SLS/194806 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/11/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1011, name: WATERBUCK Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1991 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
11/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1948. Dep: 23/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61011 |
||
18/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 18/01/1949. Dep: 01/02/1949. | ||
09/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1949. Dep: 06/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9728 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/08/1950. Dep: 15/08/1950. | ||
31/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1951. Dep: 24/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28133 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/05/1952. Dep: 30/05/1952. | ||
12/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1952. Dep: 06/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28266 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/09/1952. Dep: 10/09/1952. | ||
18/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954. | ||
20/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/07/1955. Dep: 09/08/1955. | ||
24/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1956. Dep: 23/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28102 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
13/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1958. Dep: 10/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28191 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
22/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
04/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/04/1960. Dep: 14/04/1960. | ||
15/07/1960 | Allocation | Loaned to Gorton (9G) | ||
17/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
13/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1960. Dep: 15/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28508 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
13/01/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
02/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61011 from Gorton (9G) | ||
27/11/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |