|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 25/12/1948 | 22/01/1949 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3687 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61018 |
||
Darlington Works | 14/02/1951 | 13/03/1951 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28132 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 19/03/1951 | 29/03/1951 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/04/1951 | 04/04/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1952 | 17/01/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28455 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1953 | 27/01/1953 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1955 | 28/01/1955 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1955 | 01/02/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/01/1957 | 14/02/1957 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28172 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/12/1958 | 23/01/1959 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28429 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1959 | 24/06/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 18/06/1962 | 03/08/1962 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28427 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1962 | 23/08/1962 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1962 | 26/09/1962 | 15 days | Unclassified | After derailment |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/01/1955 | North eastern Miscellany | Class D20 62372, looking clean and polished, has been working on local passenger turns between Sunderland and Newcastle during March. On Sunday, 20th March, trains between Sunderland and West Hartlepool were diverted via Wellfield, due to work on track maintenance on the main line, and the 5.0 p.m. train from Newcastle to Liverpool hauled by V2 60964 was piloted from Sunderland by G5 67328 to give assistance up Seaton bank which is 1 in 42 for about half a mile at its steepest. On Sunday, 26th March, class 5 45316 was noted descending Seaton bank with an excursion from the Midland Region. Locomotives used for football excursions to Sunderland on 30/3 included Nos. 76046. 61018 an 64851. |
SLS/195505 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
07/09/1963 | Last Whitby - Kings X through coaches | B1 61018 worked the last Whitby - King's Cross through coaches of the 1963 summer season into York on 7/9/63; 45239 passed it near York on a Blackburn - Scarborough excursion. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/02/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1018, name: GNU Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1998 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
30/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
25/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1948. Dep: 22/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3687 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61018 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
14/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1951. Dep: 13/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28132 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1951. Dep: 29/03/1951. | ||
03/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/04/1951. Dep: 04/04/1951. | ||
11/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1952. Dep: 17/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28455 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/01/1953. Dep: 27/01/1953. | ||
04/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/01/1955. Dep: 28/01/1955. | ||
31/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/01/1955. Dep: 01/02/1955. | ||
19/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1957. Dep: 14/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28172 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) | ||
17/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1958. Dep: 23/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28429 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
15/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1959. Dep: 24/06/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
20/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
18/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1962. Dep: 03/08/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28427 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/08/1962. Dep: 23/08/1962. | ||
12/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/09/1962. Dep: 26/09/1962. Work undertaken: After derailment |
||
07/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61018 from York (North) (50A) | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |