|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 02/06/1948 | 02/07/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3708 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61019 |
||
Gateshead Works | 12/01/1950 | 25/01/1950 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1950 | 01/09/1950 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 5075 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1950 | 12/09/1950 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 23/01/1952 | 01/02/1952 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1952 | 10/05/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28280 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1952 | 20/05/1952 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1952 | 15/10/1952 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1953 | 19/02/1953 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1953 | 26/08/1953 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/03/1954 | 18/03/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 28/05/1954 | 15/06/1954 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1954 | 08/10/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28182 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 07/11/1955 | 24/11/1955 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 09/01/1956 | 25/01/1956 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1956 | 17/02/1956 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 30/10/1956 | 07/12/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28175 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1957 | 06/02/1957 | 31 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/03/1958 | 25/03/1958 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1959 | 09/04/1959 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28238 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1959 | 28/04/1959 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1959 | 30/06/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1962 | 17/03/1962 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28346 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1963 | 02/09/1963 | 15 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/07/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order. Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year. No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751. Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420. |
SLS/194808 |
31/07/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order. Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year. No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751. Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420. |
SLS/194808 |
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) | Ex-Works on 51A: D3072, D3874, D5108, 43055, 43101, 60835, 60939, 61019/39, 63388, 65794, 65889/92, 68011, 80116, 90072, 90342, 90503. Waiting works on 51A: 12115, 43070/5, 46494, 60811/44, 61237, 68754, 78015, 92098. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/02/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1019, name: NILGHAI Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1999 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
02/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1948. Dep: 02/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3708 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61019 |
||
29/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
31/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
06/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
02/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
08/01/1949 | Allocation | |||
12/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/01/1950. Dep: 25/01/1950. | ||
09/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1950. Dep: 01/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5075 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1950. Dep: 12/09/1950. | ||
23/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/01/1952. Dep: 01/02/1952. | ||
15/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1952. Dep: 10/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28280 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/05/1952. Dep: 20/05/1952. | ||
10/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/10/1952. Dep: 15/10/1952. | ||
10/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/02/1953. Dep: 19/02/1953. | ||
18/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/08/1953. Dep: 26/08/1953. | ||
17/01/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
15/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/03/1954. Dep: 18/03/1954. | ||
28/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/05/1954. Dep: 15/06/1954. | ||
07/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1954. Dep: 08/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28182 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/11/1955. Dep: 24/11/1955. | ||
09/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/01/1956. Dep: 25/01/1956. | ||
09/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/02/1956. Dep: 17/02/1956. | ||
30/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1956. Dep: 07/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28175 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1957. Dep: 06/02/1957. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
10/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
10/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1958. Dep: 25/03/1958. | ||
09/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1959. Dep: 09/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28238 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
15/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/04/1959. Dep: 28/04/1959. | ||
29/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/06/1959. Dep: 30/06/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
12/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1962. Dep: 17/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28346 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Alnmouth (52d) | ||
24/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
19/08/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/08/1963. Dep: 02/09/1963. | ||
03/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
12/03/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61019 from York (North) (50A) | ||
07/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |