|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/11/1948 | 25/12/1948 | 36 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61025 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/10/1950 | 30/11/1950 | 42 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1953 | 26/03/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28211 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1953 | 02/04/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1953 | 13/06/1953 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/01/1955 | 04/02/1955 | 33 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1955 | 30/07/1955 | 26 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1955 | 03/08/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1957 | 07/09/1957 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28126 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1957 | 11/09/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1960 | 18/02/1960 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1960 | 21/10/1960 | 4 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1960 | 28/01/1960 | -298 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1961 | 12/05/1961 | 17 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/04/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1025, name: PALLAH Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2005 Allocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
29/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
31/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
06/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
20/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1948. Dep: 25/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61025 |
||
20/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/10/1950. Dep: 30/11/1950. | ||
25/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1953. Dep: 26/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28211 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1953. Dep: 02/04/1953. | ||
25/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/05/1953. Dep: 13/06/1953. | ||
03/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/01/1955. Dep: 04/02/1955. | ||
05/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1955. Dep: 30/07/1955. | ||
02/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/08/1955. Dep: 03/08/1955. | ||
14/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1957. Dep: 07/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28126 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1957. Dep: 11/09/1957. | ||
28/01/1960 | Modification | Diagram 100A number 28162 boiler fitted | ||
28/01/1960 | Modification | Modification: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted | ||
11/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1960. Dep: 18/02/1960. | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
18/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/10/1960. Dep: 21/10/1960. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
22/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1960. Dep: 28/01/1960. | ||
26/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/04/1961. Dep: 12/05/1961. | ||
04/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Alnmouth (52d) | ||
02/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61025 from Alnmouth (52D.1) | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |