|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1947 | 10/12/1947 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1949 | 13/04/1949 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 5061 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61028 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/06/1949 | 24/06/1949 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/08/1950 | 30/08/1950 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 9831 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1952 | 21/02/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28176 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1953 | 29/07/1953 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 28865 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1955 | 19/02/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28460 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/06/1955 | 04/07/1955 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1956 | 08/02/1956 | 23 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1956 | 23/05/1956 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/07/1956 | 20/07/1956 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1957 | 27/02/1957 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28348 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1959 | 03/03/1959 | 23 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1959 | 24/04/1959 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1959 | 24/09/1959 | 42 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1961 | 23/06/1961 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28949 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/01/1955 | York MPD | 69369 (34E) mentioned in last month's notes, duly proceeded to Darlington (Bank Top), but was not accepted into North Road works. After returning to York, it spent a considerable time under repair in York shed before proceeding to Darnall (39B) on transfer. 'J25' 65650 an 65654 are now in store at York together with 62345. On 15th January, a Sheffield to Middlesbrough football excursion (M886) was worked throughout by 44855 (19A), which took water in York station platforms. On the same date 61028 (38C) was at York en route for Darlington works for repair. Other GC Section 'Bls' for Darlington works recently have included 61141 (38C), 61152 (39B) and 61328 (40B). 'Patriot' 45510 (5A) was an unusual visitor at York on 17th January. On 21st January, the 9.22 a.m. Leeds (City) to Scarborough was worked by 'B16/1' 61445 (50B) instead of the usual Holbeck Class 5, but 44853 (20A) worked the 3.10 p.m. York to Leeds (City). | SLS/195503 |
12/08/1957 | Aylesbury | Following the withdrawal of the Watlington branch passenger services, the daily freight working is worked by Aylesbury (34E). The branch is no longer the responsibility of Slough (81B). One of the two Neasden J15's (65390, 65404) is stabled here at fortnightly intervals for this duty. On 18th August, Aylesbury shed housed 1473, 5424, 61028/77, 65390, 67752, 76037 an 80143. The two W.R. locomotives regularly shedded here (1473, 5409) are washed out at Banbury which supplies replacements when this is being done. | SLS/195709 |
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/05/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1028, name: UMSEKE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2008 Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
25/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/11/1947. Dep: 10/12/1947. | ||
17/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1949. Dep: 13/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5061 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61028 |
||
10/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/06/1949. Dep: 24/06/1949. | ||
04/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1950. Dep: 30/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9831 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1952. Dep: 21/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28176 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1953. Dep: 29/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28865 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
21/11/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
20/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1955. Dep: 19/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28460 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/06/1955. Dep: 04/07/1955. | ||
17/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/01/1956. Dep: 08/02/1956. | ||
15/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1956. Dep: 23/05/1956. | ||
12/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/07/1956. Dep: 20/07/1956. | ||
05/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1957. Dep: 27/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28348 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1959. Dep: 03/03/1959. | ||
12/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
14/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/04/1959. Dep: 24/04/1959. | ||
02/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
14/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/08/1959. Dep: 24/09/1959. | ||
29/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1961. Dep: 23/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28949 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61028 from Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
22/03/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |