|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 15/11/1949 | 10/12/1949 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 4015 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61030 |
||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1951 | 10/01/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28244 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/12/1953 | 24/12/1953 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 28227 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1956 | 28/05/1956 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28261 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1958 | 23/05/1958 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28264 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1958 | 09/07/1958 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1960 | 23/12/1960 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 28449 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1962 | 05/07/1962 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1964 | 04/09/1964 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 28309 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/07/1947 | Darlington Works | Names and Works' Nos. checked of new 'Bl' locos. built here, are: Nos. 1030 Nyala (2010/47), 1031 Reedbuck (2011/47), 1032 Stembok (2012/47) and 1033 Dibatag (2013/47). | SLS/194709 |
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington MPD (Shed) | On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. | SLS/196410 |
02/07/1967 | Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Low Moor) | Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). | SLS/196708 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/06/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1030, name: NYALA Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2010 Allocated to Stockton (SKN) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
15/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1949. Dep: 10/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4015 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61030 |
||
10/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1951. Dep: 10/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28244 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1953. Dep: 24/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28227 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1956. Dep: 28/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28261 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1958. Dep: 23/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28264 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/07/1958. Dep: 09/07/1958. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
20/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
18/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1960. Dep: 23/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28449 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
14/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/06/1962. Dep: 05/07/1962. | ||
25/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
22/06/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1964. Dep: 04/09/1964. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28309 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
22/01/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
25/06/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
30/09/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61030 from Low Moor (55J) | ||
11/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield |