Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 90 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6146 Week
» 20723 Month
» 383968 Year
» 460555 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1033   29/08/1947
BR 61033   17/01/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
29/08/1947 DIBATAG

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 2013
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Mon 29/08/1947 to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)
Withdrawal Mon 25/03/1963 off Canklow (41D)
Scrapping Mon 25/03/1963 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 15 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes In 25/3/63 for cutting up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 29/08/1947
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 21/09/1947
37A Ardsley 04/06/1950
37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 15/10/1950
37A Ardsley 06/01/1952
30A Stratford 22/09/1952
38A Colwick 19/10/1952
31A Cambridge 24/10/1954
41A Sheffield Darnall 28/10/1956
40A Lincoln 04/11/1962
41D Canklow 02/12/1962
   Withdrawn 25/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 29/08/1947
ALLOC COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 21/09/1947
ALLOC 37A Ardsley m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 16/10/1950
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 01/12/1962
ALLOC 41D Canklow 2w/e 15/12/1962
WDN   25/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/08/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 3712)
17/01/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9866)
09/01/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28374)
11/02/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28816)
06/05/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28574)
17/06/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28982)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 12/12/1949 17/01/1950 37 days General
Boiler number 28187 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61033
 
Doncaster Works 24/03/1952 23/04/1952 31 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 28/10/1953 09/01/1954 74 days General
Boiler number 28374 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1954 19/01/1954 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 20/01/1954 21/01/1954 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 29/01/1954 06/02/1954 9 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 13/11/1955 11/02/1956 91 days General
Boiler number 28816 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 08/04/1958 06/05/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 3446 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 20/05/1960 17/06/1960 29 days General
Boiler number 28982 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/08/1947 To Service To service as LNER Number 1033, name: DIBATAG
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2013
Allocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
21/09/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
12/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1949. Dep: 17/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28187 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61033
   
04/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
15/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
06/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
24/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 24/03/1952. Dep: 23/04/1952.    
22/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
28/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1953. Dep: 09/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28374 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/01/1954. Dep: 19/01/1954.    
20/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/01/1954. Dep: 21/01/1954.    
29/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/01/1954. Dep: 06/02/1954.    
24/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
13/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1955. Dep: 11/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28816 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
08/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1958. Dep: 06/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3446 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1960. Dep: 17/06/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28982 (Diagram 100A)
   
04/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
25/03/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    
25/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 61033 from Canklow (41D)    

prev prev