|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1949 | 17/01/1950 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28187 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61033 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1952 | 23/04/1952 | 31 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1953 | 09/01/1954 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 28374 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1954 | 19/01/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1954 | 21/01/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1954 | 06/02/1954 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 13/11/1955 | 11/02/1956 | 91 days | General | Boiler number 28816 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1958 | 06/05/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28574 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1960 | 17/06/1960 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28982 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/08/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1033, name: DIBATAG Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2013 Allocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
21/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
12/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1949. Dep: 17/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28187 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61033 |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
15/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
16/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
06/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
26/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
24/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 24/03/1952. Dep: 23/04/1952. | ||
22/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
19/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
28/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1953. Dep: 09/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28374 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/01/1954. Dep: 19/01/1954. | ||
20/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/01/1954. Dep: 21/01/1954. | ||
29/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/01/1954. Dep: 06/02/1954. | ||
24/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
13/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1955. Dep: 11/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28816 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
08/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1958. Dep: 06/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28574 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1960. Dep: 17/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28982 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
25/03/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
25/03/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61033 from Canklow (41D) |