Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1036   20/11/1947
BR 61036   03/05/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
20/11/1947 RALPH ASSHETON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 2016
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 20/11/1947 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping Thu 01/11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 14 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys

Notes
Notes Was to have been named KORRIGUM
In 1/11/62 for cutting up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) 20/11/1947
DON Doncaster 03/07/1949
STR Stratford 25/08/1949
CAM Cambridge 20/11/1949
DON Doncaster 02/12/1949
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW GOR Gorton 20/11/1947
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 09/07/1949
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 27/08/1949
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 26/11/1949
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 03/12/1949
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
20/11/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 3755)
03/05/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9680)
25/01/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28171)
01/01/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28100)
23/12/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28757)
19/04/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28169)
21/04/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28241)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 28/02/1949 01/03/1949 2 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 29/03/1950 03/05/1950 36 days General
Boiler number 9680 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61036
 
Doncaster Works 02/01/1952 25/01/1952 24 days General
Boiler number 28171 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 07/12/1953 01/01/1954 26 days General
Boiler number 28100 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 29/11/1955 23/12/1955 25 days General
Boiler number 28757 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 12/11/1956 16/11/1956 5 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 19/03/1958 19/04/1958 32 days General
Boiler number 28169 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 27/08/1959 05/09/1959 10 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 14/03/1960 21/04/1960 39 days General
Boiler number 28241 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/11/1947 To Service To service as LNER Number 1036, name: RALPH ASSHETON
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2016
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
28/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/02/1949. Dep: 01/03/1949.    
03/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
20/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
02/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
29/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1950. Dep: 03/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9680 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61036
   
02/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1952. Dep: 25/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28171 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1953. Dep: 01/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28100 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1955. Dep: 23/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28757 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/11/1956. Dep: 16/11/1956.    
19/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1958. Dep: 19/04/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28169 (Diagram 100A)
   
27/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/08/1959. Dep: 05/09/1959.    
14/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1960. Dep: 21/04/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28241 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61036 from Doncaster (36A)    
01/11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev