|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 06/01/1950 | 15/02/1950 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3740 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61037 |
||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1952 | 08/03/1952 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 28407 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1952 | 13/03/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1954 | 20/03/1954 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28400 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1954 | 27/03/1954 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1956 | 07/06/1956 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28513 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/04/1958 | 09/05/1958 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28232 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1958 | 09/07/1958 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1959 | 14/05/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1959 | 05/06/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1961 | 25/02/1961 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28127 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1947 | Darlington Works | New 'B.1' Class 4-6-0 No. 1036 (Dar. 2016/47) has appeared with the name Ralph Assheton, No. 1037 Jairou (Dar. 2017/47), No. 1038 Blacktail (Dar. 2018/47) and No. 1039 Steinbok (Dar. 2019/47); the plate dates of the last two are December. The first of the 'L1' Class 2-6-4T's to be built here, 9001 was completed in December and on 29/12 was in the Paint Shop. A number of 'Atlantics' have arrived on Works and include 'C6' Nos. 2931/34/41/47; 'Cl' 2991/96; with the exception of No. 2941, all have recently been withdrawn. 'D2' No. 2178 and 'C1' No. 2835 have now gone in for scrapping, while the last 'B15' No. 1696 is on the Works road at the shed. No. 508 is awaiting shops. | SLS/194801 |
28/02/1954 | Darlington Works | North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. | SLS/195404 |
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Waiting Works) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/11/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1037, name: JAIROU Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2017 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
22/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
28/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
06/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1950. Dep: 15/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3740 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61037 |
||
18/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1952. Dep: 08/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28407 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1952. Dep: 13/03/1952. | ||
24/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1954. Dep: 20/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28400 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1954. Dep: 27/03/1954. | ||
08/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1956. Dep: 07/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28513 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1958. Dep: 09/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28232 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) | ||
07/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/07/1958. Dep: 09/07/1958. | ||
04/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1959. Dep: 14/05/1959. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
04/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/06/1959. Dep: 05/06/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
26/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1961. Dep: 25/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28127 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61037 from Darlington (51A) | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |