|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 24/10/1950 | 25/11/1950 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 9896 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61038 |
||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1952 | 19/07/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28443 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1953 | 13/10/1953 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1954 | 29/09/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28181 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1956 | 28/09/1956 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28189 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1956 | 02/10/1956 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1958 | 19/08/1958 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28416 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1958 | 03/12/1958 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1959 | 27/02/1959 | 12 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1959 | 15/06/1959 | 12 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1959 | 25/09/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified | B16 type waterscoop fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1960 | 28/10/1960 | 46 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1964 | 29/09/1964 | 155 days | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1947 | Darlington Works | New 'B.1' Class 4-6-0 No. 1036 (Dar. 2016/47) has appeared with the name Ralph Assheton, No. 1037 Jairou (Dar. 2017/47), No. 1038 Blacktail (Dar. 2018/47) and No. 1039 Steinbok (Dar. 2019/47); the plate dates of the last two are December. The first of the 'L1' Class 2-6-4T's to be built here, 9001 was completed in December and on 29/12 was in the Paint Shop. A number of 'Atlantics' have arrived on Works and include 'C6' Nos. 2931/34/41/47; 'Cl' 2991/96; with the exception of No. 2941, all have recently been withdrawn. 'D2' No. 2178 and 'C1' No. 2835 have now gone in for scrapping, while the last 'B15' No. 1696 is on the Works road at the shed. No. 508 is awaiting shops. | SLS/194801 |
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington Works (Yard) | New Engine Shop: D3940, 12116, tender of 60530. Main Erecting shop: 60530 Sayajirao, 60844, 61214, 61330, 62059, 73095, 73132, 76095/9, 93368/610, D2246/72, D3657. Yard Paint shop: 60118 Archibald Sturrock. Yard: 43008 an 62041 being painted, 60522 Straight Deal, 60145 Saint Mungo, 60011 frames only, 61038 without nameplates, 61084, 63393, 65033/99, 43123, 44734, 68062, D2700, 90407; North Rd. scrap yard: 61229, 61321 and tender of 60020. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/12/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1038, name: BLACKTAIL Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2018 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
17/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
23/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
24/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1950. Dep: 25/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9896 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61038 |
||
26/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1952. Dep: 19/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28443 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/09/1953. Dep: 13/10/1953. | ||
31/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1954. Dep: 29/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28181 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1956. Dep: 28/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28189 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1956. Dep: 02/10/1956. | ||
05/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
04/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1958. Dep: 19/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28416 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 03/12/1958. Dep: 03/12/1958. | ||
16/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1959. Dep: 27/02/1959. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
04/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/06/1959. Dep: 15/06/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
17/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/09/1959. Dep: 25/09/1959. Work undertaken: B16 type waterscoop fitted |
||
13/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/09/1960. Dep: 28/10/1960. | ||
15/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
30/04/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
04/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
24/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
28/04/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 28/04/1964. Dep: 29/09/1964. | ||
01/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61038 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
09/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale |