|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 21/06/1949 | 02/07/1949 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1949 | 21/12/1949 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 9926 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61039 |
||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1949 | 09/01/1950 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1952 | 29/02/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28402 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 09/06/1952 | 18/06/1952 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1954 | 03/04/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28209 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1956 | 20/04/1956 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/08/1956 | 31/08/1956 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28535 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1956 | 12/09/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1958 | 14/11/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28342 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1958 | 03/12/1958 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1959 | 17/10/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1962 | 09/03/1962 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28172 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1962 | 22/03/1962 | 8 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1947 | Darlington Works | New 'B.1' Class 4-6-0 No. 1036 (Dar. 2016/47) has appeared with the name Ralph Assheton, No. 1037 Jairou (Dar. 2017/47), No. 1038 Blacktail (Dar. 2018/47) and No. 1039 Steinbok (Dar. 2019/47); the plate dates of the last two are December. The first of the 'L1' Class 2-6-4T's to be built here, 9001 was completed in December and on 29/12 was in the Paint Shop. A number of 'Atlantics' have arrived on Works and include 'C6' Nos. 2931/34/41/47; 'Cl' 2991/96; with the exception of No. 2941, all have recently been withdrawn. 'D2' No. 2178 and 'C1' No. 2835 have now gone in for scrapping, while the last 'B15' No. 1696 is on the Works road at the shed. No. 508 is awaiting shops. | SLS/194801 |
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Outside Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) | Ex-Works on 51A: D3072, D3874, D5108, 43055, 43101, 60835, 60939, 61019/39, 63388, 65794, 65889/92, 68011, 80116, 90072, 90342, 90503. Waiting works on 51A: 12115, 43070/5, 46494, 60811/44, 61237, 68754, 78015, 92098. | SLS/196205 |
08/07/1962 | York South MPD | Stored in the old south shed are 60887/95/939/82 all ex works, 61039, 61240 and 90467/571/8/663, also four BRCW d.m.us. damaged in a collision in March, viz. uE50543/76/9201/22, all noted 8th July. | SLS/196208 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/12/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1039 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2019 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
21/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/06/1949. Dep: 02/07/1949. | ||
23/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1949. Dep: 21/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9926 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61039 |
||
28/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/12/1949. Dep: 09/01/1950. | ||
30/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1952. Dep: 29/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28402 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/06/1952. Dep: 18/06/1952. | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
08/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1954. Dep: 03/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28209 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/04/1956. Dep: 20/04/1956. | ||
01/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1956. Dep: 31/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28535 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1956. Dep: 12/09/1956. | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
13/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1958. Dep: 14/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28342 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/11/1958. Dep: 03/12/1958. | ||
08/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/10/1959. Dep: 17/10/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
08/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
02/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1962. Dep: 09/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28172 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/03/1962. Dep: 22/03/1962. | ||
06/08/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
10/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
01/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
28/03/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
27/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61039 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
08/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |