|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 06/05/1946 | 07/05/1946 | 2 days | Weighing | |||
Stratford Works | 03/09/1947 | 13/09/1947 | 11 days | Heavy | |||
Stratford Works | 26/04/1948 | 12/06/1948 | 48 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61040 |
||
Stratford Works | 30/12/1948 | 18/01/1949 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 12/05/1950 | 24/06/1950 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28565 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 20/08/1951 | 31/08/1951 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/12/1951 | 19/01/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28240 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1952 | 06/03/1952 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1953 | 16/11/1953 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1954 | 05/03/1954 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1954 | 29/05/1954 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28447 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1954 | 01/06/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1956 | 10/07/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28406 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/09/1958 | 24/10/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28458 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1960 | 05/11/1960 | 11 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1962 | 31/05/1962 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28440 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1962 | 29/06/1962 | 24 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/04/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1040 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25796 Allocated to Stratford (STR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
06/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 06/05/1946. Dep: 07/05/1946. | ||
21/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
03/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/09/1947. Dep: 13/09/1947. | ||
26/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1948. Dep: 12/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61040 |
||
30/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/12/1948. Dep: 18/01/1949. | ||
12/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1950. Dep: 24/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28565 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/08/1951. Dep: 31/08/1951. | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
14/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1951. Dep: 19/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28240 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/02/1952. Dep: 06/03/1952. | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
21/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/10/1953. Dep: 16/11/1953. | ||
26/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/02/1954. Dep: 05/03/1954. | ||
04/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1954. Dep: 29/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28447 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/05/1954. Dep: 01/06/1954. | ||
08/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1956. Dep: 10/07/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28406 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
19/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1958. Dep: 24/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28458 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
15/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
22/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
26/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/10/1960. Dep: 05/11/1960. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
20/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
26/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1962. Dep: 31/05/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28440 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/06/1962. Dep: 29/06/1962. | ||
10/07/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61040 from Wakefield (56A) | ||
08/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by R A Kings: Norwich |