|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 17/06/1947 | 28/06/1947 | 12 days | Heavy | Boiler number 28543 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 03/05/1948 | 02/07/1948 | 61 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61042 |
||
Stratford Works | 08/01/1950 | 13/01/1950 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 28/02/1950 | 06/05/1950 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 5099 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 06/09/1950 | 23/09/1950 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 01/01/1952 | 09/02/1952 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28575 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 13/01/1953 | 15/01/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1953 | 29/08/1953 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 28349 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/05/1955 | 11/06/1955 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28588 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 04/03/1957 | 26/04/1957 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 28841 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 21/10/1957 | 23/11/1957 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 26/01/1959 | 13/03/1959 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28505 (Diagram 100A) BTH speed indicator fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1960 | 26/03/1960 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1960 | 21/04/1960 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1961 | 26/01/1961 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1961 | 02/12/1961 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28452 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/03/1950 | Stratford Works | One of the two 0-4-0T tram engines-No. 68083- has just been through shops. The crest is on the undercarriage, below the wooden body. One of the 0-6-0T tram engines has the words 'British Railways' in the same position, and does not look as neat. Locomotives in the new shops were Nos. 61004/42/50/54/89, 61332/35. 1639. 62531, 3040. 63101, 7160, 68527, 69704, 90013, 90502. ex-W.D. 77013, 79312 and outside awaiting shopping were Nos. 61235, 61559, 8386, 8647, 9684, 90392. The three Crane locomotives are now renumbered; No. 68667 noted 3/49, No. 68668 2/50 and No. 68669 3/50 (with crest). These dates are not given in the official lists, and the actual dates will be slightly earlier. In the Paint Shop were Nos. 61540 (lined), 61554. 68088, 68225, 68651, 69641, 69728; and in the old Works Nos. 61058, 61336, 61558, 62509, 2584, 2601. 62790, 2794, 4644/83, 65462, 65545/57, 7155, 7226, 8375, 8519/61, 8772, 8874/81, 9639/69. | SLS/195005 |
08/02/1954 | Cambridge Line services | B1 class engines continue to deputise for 'Britannias' on occasions on the Cambridge line services, and the new spirit which pervades the G.E. has led to some very creditable running by these engines. No. 61042 on the 12.35 p.m. Yarmouth with 336 tons net, 360 full, dropped 20 seconds to Audley End with a maximum of 58 m.p.h. at Great Chesterford, speed not falling below 49 on the climb past Littlebury. The 41 miles thence to Liverpool Street were run in 56 minutes (54 net) with a maximum of 68 at Burnt Hill. B1 and B17 engines were responsible for all traffic on Sunday, 17th -January, when trains were diverted via Audley End and Bartlow due to engineering works. Similar arrangements, but not affecting the evening services, were in operation on the previous Sunday, 10th January. For trains stopping at Audley End this diversion necessitates attacking the long climb at 1:82 off the branch platform at Audley End. The transfer of No. 42104 to Neasden is noteworthy, as it is believed to be a new class for this shed. | SLS/195404 |
12/11/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside New Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: 13166, D8239, E3069-75; Outside New Erecting Shop: D5583, 61042, 61317, 73000/165. Stripping Road: 60015, 63973/87, 70041. Crimpsal: D3646. 43151, 60108; Outside Crimpsall: 60003/29/149, 73024 (89A). Erecting Shop: D3153, D3447/8, D3476-8, D5520, D5609/37/66, D5802, 43160, 60023/65/127/525, 70000/8, 73054; Outside Erecting Shop: 60154, 76045. Weigh House: D366; Outside Weigh House: 61389. Paint Shop: E3068, D3254, D5050, D5360, D5606, D5822 (Brush 323/61), D9017 (EE2922, V574 of 1961), 60021/162, 62037, 63980, 70013. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Weigh House) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
09/09/1963 | Lincoln MPD | The allocation of D1531/2/3/4 to Darnall has released Brush d/es D5801/2/3/53/4 for work at Lincoln and eventual elimination of steam but on 9th September the steam allocation was-43086/95/104/5/49, 61006/26/41/2/58/89/95/107/13/62/223/58/348/84/409, 90223/460/577. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/05/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1042 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25799 Allocated to Cambridge (CAM) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
22/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
17/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/06/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28543 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1948. Dep: 02/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61042 |
||
08/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/01/1950. Dep: 13/01/1950. | ||
28/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5099 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/09/1950. Dep: 23/09/1950. | ||
01/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1952. Dep: 09/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28575 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/01/1953. Dep: 15/01/1953. | ||
07/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1953. Dep: 29/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28349 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1955. Dep: 11/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28588 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) | ||
24/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
04/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1957. Dep: 26/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28841 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/10/1957. Dep: 23/11/1957. | ||
26/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1959. Dep: 13/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28505 (Diagram 100A) BTH speed indicator fitted |
||
29/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
21/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
14/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1960. Dep: 26/03/1960. | ||
01/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/04/1960. Dep: 21/04/1960. | ||
16/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/01/1961. Dep: 26/01/1961. | ||
18/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1961. Dep: 02/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28452 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
26/09/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
28/11/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
17/04/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61042 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
05/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |