|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1946 | 12/10/1946 | 19 days | Light Repair | Stone's elec fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 18/01/1948 | 23/02/1948 | 37 days | General | Front end heater connection fitted Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1046 |
||
Stratford Works | 05/10/1949 | 12/11/1949 | 39 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61046 |
||
Stratford Works | 05/10/1950 | 11/11/1950 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 17/07/1951 | 24/08/1951 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28564 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 03/08/1952 | 27/03/1953 | 237 days | General | Boiler number 28264 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 24/08/1954 | 29/09/1954 | 37 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 21/03/1955 | 30/04/1955 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28558 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 07/05/1957 | 21/06/1957 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28262 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 06/08/1958 | 12/09/1958 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 25/05/1959 | 30/07/1959 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 28526 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 16/03/1960 | 09/04/1960 | 25 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1960 | 16/08/1960 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1962 | 17/04/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/02/1948 | Stratford Works | The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 | SLS/194803 |
18/03/1959 | FA Cup excursions | The Norwich-Luton cup replay of 18th March brought the following to Birmingham New Street-Bls 61046/8 of 32A, 61204 of 31F and 61270/317 of 32A; Class 5s 44810/6 an 45238, all 14A. | SLS/195904 |
21/11/1960 | G.E. Dieselisation | Extensive dieselisation has taken place on the GE and a considerable re-shuffle of diesels between March, Ipswich and Stratford took place on 21st November. Cambridge has lost all its passenger turns (steam) and its entire allocation of Bls (61046/8/66/71/82, 61236/52/3/4/80/3) has been transferred to March and Norwich, leaving 16 steam engines allocated. South Lynn is now a sub-shed of March, its allocation being 43089/90, 65548/77 an 68499. Lowestoft has lost its 3 steam engines (65462, 65588 and 68642) to store at Trowse and is completely diesel, i.e. D2039, D2553/5/68/70/3. | SLS/196101 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/05/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1046 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25798 Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
24/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/09/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946. Work undertaken: Stone's elec fitted |
||
18/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1948. Dep: 23/02/1948. Work undertaken: Front end heater connection fitted Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1046 |
||
05/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1949. Dep: 12/11/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61046 |
||
05/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1950. Dep: 11/11/1950. | ||
17/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1951. Dep: 24/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28564 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1952. Dep: 27/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28264 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
24/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/08/1954. Dep: 29/09/1954. | ||
21/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28558 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1957. Dep: 21/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28262 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/08/1958. Dep: 12/09/1958. | ||
25/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1959. Dep: 30/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28526 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
16/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/03/1960. Dep: 09/04/1960. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
11/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1960. Dep: 16/08/1960. | ||
20/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
04/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
17/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/04/1962. Dep: 17/04/1962. | ||
24/04/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61046 from Cambridge (31A) |