Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 126 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4941 Week
» 11075 Month
» 238959 Year
» 1460524 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1046 on 29/05/1946
BR (BR Tmp) E1046   23/02/1948
BR 61046   12/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L958
Works Number 25798
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service Tue 29/05/1946 to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)
Withdrawal Tue 24/04/1962 off Cambridge (31A)
Scrapping During 04/1962 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 15 yrs, 10 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes No makers plate was ever fitted.
Cut up Doncaster

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe (New) 29/05/1946
31A Cambridge 12/06/1960
31B March 20/11/1960
31A Cambridge 11/06/1961
   Withdrawn 24/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN FAV Faversham 23/10/1948
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 3w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 26/11/1960
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 08/07/1961
WDN   24/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/05/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 3610)
23/02/1948 Front end heater connection fitted
24/08/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28564)
27/03/1953 Modified bogie springs fitted
27/03/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28264)
30/04/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28558)
21/06/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28262)
30/07/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28526)
30/07/1959 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
09/04/1960 Electrical elements of ATC fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803
18/03/1959 FA Cup excursions The Norwich-Luton cup replay of 18th March brought the following to Birmingham New Street-Bls 61046/8 of 32A, 61204 of 31F and 61270/317 of 32A; Class 5s 44810/6 an 45238, all 14A. SLS/195904
21/11/1960 G.E. Dieselisation Extensive dieselisation has taken place on the GE and a considerable re-shuffle of diesels between March, Ipswich and Stratford took place on 21st November. Cambridge has lost all its passenger turns (steam) and its entire allocation of Bls (61046/8/66/71/82, 61236/52/3/4/80/3) has been transferred to March and Norwich, leaving 16 steam engines allocated. South Lynn is now a sub-shed of March, its allocation being 43089/90, 65548/77 an 68499. Lowestoft has lost its 3 steam engines (65462, 65588 and 68642) to store at Trowse and is completely diesel, i.e. D2039, D2553/5/68/70/3. SLS/196101

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 24/09/1946 12/10/1946 19 days Light Repair
Stone's elec fitted
 
Stratford Works 18/01/1948 23/02/1948 37 days General
Front end heater connection fitted
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E1046
 
Stratford Works 05/10/1949 12/11/1949 39 days General
Renumbered to BR 61046
 
Stratford Works 05/10/1950 11/11/1950 38 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 17/07/1951 24/08/1951 39 days General
Boiler number 28564 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 03/08/1952 27/03/1953 237 days General
Boiler number 28264 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
 
Stratford Works 24/08/1954 29/09/1954 37 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 21/03/1955 30/04/1955 41 days General
Boiler number 28558 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 07/05/1957 21/06/1957 46 days General
Boiler number 28262 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 06/08/1958 12/09/1958 38 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 25/05/1959 30/07/1959 67 days General
Boiler number 28526 (Diagram 100A)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Stratford Works 16/03/1960 09/04/1960 25 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Doncaster Works 11/08/1960 16/08/1960 6 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 17/04/1962 17/04/1962 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/05/1946 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1046
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25798
Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
24/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/09/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Stone's elec fitted
   
18/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1948. Dep: 23/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Front end heater connection fitted
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E1046
   
05/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1949. Dep: 12/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61046
   
05/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1950. Dep: 11/11/1950.    
17/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1951. Dep: 24/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28564 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1952. Dep: 27/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28264 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
   
24/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/08/1954. Dep: 29/09/1954.    
21/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28558 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1957. Dep: 21/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28262 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/08/1958. Dep: 12/09/1958.    
25/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1959. Dep: 30/07/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28526 (Diagram 100A)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
16/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/03/1960. Dep: 09/04/1960.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
12/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
11/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1960. Dep: 16/08/1960.    
20/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
11/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
17/04/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/04/1962. Dep: 17/04/1962.    
24/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61046 from Cambridge (31A)    

prev prev