Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1048   06/06/1946
BR 61048   24/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L958
Works Number 25804
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 06/06/1946 to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962 off Stratford (30A)
Scrapping Mon 03/12/1962 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 16 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes In 3/12/62 for cutting up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe (New) 06/06/1946
31A Cambridge 12/06/1960
31B March 20/11/1960
31A Cambridge 11/06/1961
30A Stratford 17/06/1962
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 3w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 26/11/1960
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 30A Stratford 2w/e 23/06/1962
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/06/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5069)
01/09/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5064)
29/04/1948 Front end heater connection fitted
07/01/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5066)
20/07/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28147)
20/03/1953 Modified bogie springs fitted
20/03/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28555)
01/04/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28292)
14/06/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28186)
05/09/1959 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
05/09/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28541)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Stratford Works 12/08/1947 01/09/1947 21 days Heavy
Boiler number 5064 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 30/03/1948 29/04/1948 31 days General
Front end heater connection fitted
Renumbered to BR 61048
 
Stratford Works 22/05/1948 11/06/1948 21 days Unclassified
Specially painted
 
Stratford Works 29/07/1949 13/08/1949 16 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 27/11/1949 07/01/1950 42 days General
Boiler number 5066 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 14/06/1950 28/06/1950 15 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 05/10/1950 24/10/1950 20 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 18/06/1951 20/07/1951 33 days General
Boiler number 28147 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 25/07/1951 30/07/1951 6 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 28/01/1953 20/03/1953 52 days General
Boiler number 28555 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
 
Stratford Works 14/02/1955 01/04/1955 47 days General
Boiler number 28292 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 24/04/1957 14/06/1957 52 days General
Boiler number 28186 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 21/07/1958 13/08/1958 24 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 27/07/1959 05/09/1959 41 days General
Boiler number 28541 (Diagram 100A)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Stratford Works 13/04/1960 14/05/1960 32 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/06/1946 To Service To service as LNER Number 1048
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25804
Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
12/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/08/1947. Dep: 01/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5064 (Diagram 100A)
   
30/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1948. Dep: 29/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Front end heater connection fitted
Renumbered to BR 61048
   
22/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/05/1948. Dep: 11/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Specially painted
   
29/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/07/1949. Dep: 13/08/1949.    
27/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1949. Dep: 07/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5066 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/06/1950. Dep: 28/06/1950.    
05/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1950. Dep: 24/10/1950.    
18/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1951. Dep: 20/07/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28147 (Diagram 100A)
   
25/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/07/1951. Dep: 30/07/1951.    
28/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1953. Dep: 20/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28555 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
   
14/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1955. Dep: 01/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28292 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1957. Dep: 14/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28186 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/07/1958. Dep: 13/08/1958.    
27/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1959. Dep: 05/09/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28541 (Diagram 100A)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
13/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/04/1960. Dep: 14/05/1960.    
12/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
11/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
17/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61048 from Stratford (30A)    
03/12/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev