|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 27/09/1946 | 23/10/1946 | 27 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Stratford Works | 02/01/1948 | 18/02/1948 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 3841 (Diagram 100A) Front end heater connection fitted Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1056 |
||
Stratford Works | 08/05/1949 | 06/08/1949 | 91 days | General | Boiler number 3762 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61056 |
||
Stratford Works | 06/12/1949 | 13/12/1949 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 04/02/1951 | 16/03/1951 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28537 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 06/04/1952 | 08/05/1952 | 33 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 09/09/1952 | 04/10/1952 | 26 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 09/05/1953 | 09/06/1953 | 32 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1954 | 20/03/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28850 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1954 | 04/09/1954 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1955 | 07/12/1955 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1956 | 18/12/1956 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28575 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 06/10/1958 | 05/12/1958 | 61 days | General | Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/06/1961 | 22/07/1961 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28347 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/02/1948 | Stratford Works (Paint Shop) | The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 | SLS/194803 |
02/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsall) | New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196108 |
16/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/07/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1056 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25812 Allocated to Ipswich (IPS) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
27/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/09/1946. Dep: 23/10/1946. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
02/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1948. Dep: 18/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3841 (Diagram 100A) Front end heater connection fitted Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1056 |
||
08/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1949. Dep: 06/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3762 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61056 |
||
06/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1949. Dep: 13/12/1949. | ||
04/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1951. Dep: 16/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28537 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
19/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
16/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
06/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/04/1952. Dep: 08/05/1952. | ||
29/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
09/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/09/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952. | ||
09/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1953. Dep: 09/06/1953. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
06/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1954. Dep: 20/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28850 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/08/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954. | ||
26/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/11/1955. Dep: 07/12/1955. | ||
21/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1956. Dep: 18/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28575 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
06/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1958. Dep: 05/12/1958. Work undertaken: Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
22/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
24/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
16/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1961. Dep: 22/07/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28347 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
19/04/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61056 from Immingham (40B) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |