|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 24/04/1947 | 11/05/1947 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 23/08/1948 | 25/09/1948 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3832 (Diagram 100A) Front end heater connection fitted Renumbered to BR 61058 |
||
Stratford Works | 19/02/1950 | 12/05/1950 | 83 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 25/11/1951 | 04/01/1952 | 41 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 06/05/1952 | 17/05/1952 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 13/01/1953 | 31/01/1953 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 01/07/1953 | 29/08/1953 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 28337 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 06/12/1954 | 22/12/1954 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 27/06/1955 | 20/08/1955 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 28256 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 13/05/1957 | 28/06/1957 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28292 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 14/01/1959 | 20/02/1959 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28538 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1960 | 31/08/1960 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1962 | 03/04/1962 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28146 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/03/1950 | Stratford Works | One of the two 0-4-0T tram engines-No. 68083- has just been through shops. The crest is on the undercarriage, below the wooden body. One of the 0-6-0T tram engines has the words 'British Railways' in the same position, and does not look as neat. Locomotives in the new shops were Nos. 61004/42/50/54/89, 61332/35. 1639. 62531, 3040. 63101, 7160, 68527, 69704, 90013, 90502. ex-W.D. 77013, 79312 and outside awaiting shopping were Nos. 61235, 61559, 8386, 8647, 9684, 90392. The three Crane locomotives are now renumbered; No. 68667 noted 3/49, No. 68668 2/50 and No. 68669 3/50 (with crest). These dates are not given in the official lists, and the actual dates will be slightly earlier. In the Paint Shop were Nos. 61540 (lined), 61554. 68088, 68225, 68651, 69641, 69728; and in the old Works Nos. 61058, 61336, 61558, 62509, 2584, 2601. 62790, 2794, 4644/83, 65462, 65545/57, 7155, 7226, 8375, 8519/61, 8772, 8874/81, 9639/69. | SLS/195005 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
09/09/1963 | Lincoln MPD | The allocation of D1531/2/3/4 to Darnall has released Brush d/es D5801/2/3/53/4 for work at Lincoln and eventual elimination of steam but on 9th September the steam allocation was-43086/95/104/5/49, 61006/26/41/2/58/89/95/107/13/62/223/58/348/84/409, 90223/460/577. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/07/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1058 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25814 Allocated to Ipswich (IPS) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
24/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/04/1947. Dep: 11/05/1947. | ||
23/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1948. Dep: 25/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3832 (Diagram 100A) Front end heater connection fitted Renumbered to BR 61058 |
||
19/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1950. Dep: 12/05/1950. | ||
25/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1951. Dep: 04/01/1952. | ||
06/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1952. Dep: 17/05/1952. | ||
13/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/01/1953. Dep: 31/01/1953. | ||
01/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1953. Dep: 29/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28337 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/12/1954. Dep: 22/12/1954. | ||
27/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1955. Dep: 20/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28256 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1957. Dep: 28/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28292 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1959. Dep: 20/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28538 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
22/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
27/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
29/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/08/1960. Dep: 31/08/1960. | ||
22/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1962. Dep: 03/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28146 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
03/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
10/02/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61058 from Immingham (40B) | ||
03/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |