|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 11/03/1948 | 23/04/1948 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3711 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61060 |
||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1948 | 04/05/1948 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1950 | 14/11/1950 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28110 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1950 | 28/12/1950 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1951 | 16/06/1951 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1952 | 15/01/1953 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28208 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1953 | 05/03/1953 | 3 days | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 31/12/1953 | 12/01/1954 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1954 | 14/10/1954 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28108 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/01/1956 | 25/01/1956 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1956 | 14/11/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28658 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 01/06/1959 | 30/07/1959 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 10825 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1960 | 25/05/1960 | 13 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. | SLS/194806 |
28/11/1953 | Darlington Works | North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. | SLS/195402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/08/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1060 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25816 Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
11/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1948. Dep: 23/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3711 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61060 |
||
27/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1948. Dep: 04/05/1948. | ||
16/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
22/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
19/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1950. Dep: 14/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28110 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/12/1950. Dep: 28/12/1950. | ||
11/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/06/1951. Dep: 16/06/1951. | ||
12/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1952. Dep: 15/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28208 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 03/03/1953. Dep: 05/03/1953. | ||
31/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/12/1953. Dep: 12/01/1954. | ||
17/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1954. Dep: 14/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28108 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/01/1956. Dep: 25/01/1956. | ||
17/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1956. Dep: 14/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28658 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
06/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
01/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1959. Dep: 30/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10825 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
13/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/05/1960. Dep: 25/05/1960. | ||
20/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61060 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge |