Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1066   19/08/1946
BR (Tmp) E1066   21/02/1948
BR 61066   29/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L958
Works Number 25822
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 19/08/1946 to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962 off March (31B)
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)
Service Life 16 yrs , 28 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 6/63 for scrap to Central Wagon Co, Ince

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Darnall (New) 19/08/1946
WFD Woodford Halse 27/04/1947
ANN Annesley 19/06/1949
38A Colwick 07/10/1956
31A Cambridge 06/10/1957
30A Stratford 14/09/1958
31A Cambridge 21/09/1958
31B March 20/11/1960
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse 27/04/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 25/06/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 26/11/1960
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
19/08/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5076)
29/04/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9710)
10/05/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28436)
11/09/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28405)
20/11/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28505)
09/01/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28104)
09/01/1959 Modified bogie springs fitted
15/05/1959 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
08/04/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28220)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 01/01/1948 21/02/1948 52 days General
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E1066
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1950 29/04/1950 34 days General
Boiler number 9710 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61066
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1950 06/05/1950 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 12/04/1952 10/05/1952 29 days General
Boiler number 28436 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 12/05/1952 13/05/1952 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 22/12/1952 04/02/1953 45 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1954 11/09/1954 43 days General  
Gorton Works 11/09/1954 30/09/1954 20 days Unclassified
Boiler number 28405 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 03/03/1955 12/03/1955 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/10/1956 20/11/1956 28 days General
Boiler number 3419 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 17/11/1958 09/01/1959 54 days General
Boiler number 28104 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
 
Stratford Works 20/04/1959 15/05/1959 26 days Unclassified
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 09/03/1961 08/04/1961 31 days General
Boiler number 28220 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/08/1946 To Service To service as LNER Number 1066
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25822
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
01/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1948. Dep: 21/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E1066
   
19/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
27/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1950. Dep: 29/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9710 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61066
   
03/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/05/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950.    
12/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1952. Dep: 10/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28436 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1952. Dep: 13/05/1952.    
22/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/12/1952. Dep: 04/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
31/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1954. Dep: 11/09/1954.    
15/08/1954 Sightings Gorton Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
11/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/09/1954. Dep: 30/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28405 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/03/1955. Dep: 12/03/1955.    
07/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1956. Dep: 20/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3419 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
14/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
21/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
17/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1958. Dep: 09/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28104 (Diagram 100A)
Modified bogie springs fitted
   
20/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1959. Dep: 15/05/1959.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
20/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1961. Dep: 08/04/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28220 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61066 from March (31B)    
06/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan    

prev prev