|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Inverurie Works | 15/01/1947 | 18/01/1947 | 4 days | Special | Tablet catcher apparatus fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/10/1947 | 05/12/1947 | 40 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/04/1949 | 23/04/1949 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/03/1950 | 30/03/1950 | 23 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/12/1950 | 19/01/1951 | 30 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/06/1951 | 30/06/1951 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/11/1951 | 12/12/1951 | 18 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/11/1953 | 03/11/1953 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/12/1953 | 06/02/1954 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28661 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/03/1956 | 14/04/1956 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | Water pick-up apparatus removed |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/10/1956 | 26/10/1956 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/06/1957 | 22/06/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/02/1958 | 22/03/1958 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/12/1958 | 14/01/1959 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/03/1959 | 10/04/1959 | 14 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/01/1960 | 19/03/1960 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 28635 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/11/1947 | Eastfield MPD | On 15/11 No. 1255 was observed here with the wrong Maker's Plate (26157/47), while on 23/11 No. 1256 was seen with the same plates: Nos. 1255 and 1258 were both without plates on 23/11. On 7/12 No. 1067 KIT, which had been repainted green, was seen at Cowlairs West Junction being hauled from Cowlairs Works to Eastfield by 'J.83' No. 8475. On 17/12 No. 1244 Strang Steel HAY was here, being ex Cowlairs Works that day, after having had the nameplates fitted. This is believed to be the first Scottish Area 'B.1' to receive nameplates. On 1/1 No. 1243 EFD was noted here fitted with nameplates-Sir Harold Mitchell. The size of the letters appears to be smaller than that previously used, being between 21' and 3' high. Perhaps the most interesting 'foreigners' on the shed here on the same day were: Nos. 3041 ABD, 3137 HTN and 3190 TWD, the latter carrying both TWD and HTN on the buffer-beam. Nos. 77312 STM and 77313 THJ have been noted here recently, both carrying L.M.S. 15A shed plates, as well as their L.N.E. sheds stencilled or painted on the buffer-beam. Both these engines were regular visitors to Glasgow during the war-but on the L.M.S.-when working from 12A. It is very rare for N.E. Area Class '0.7's' or W.D.'s to appear at Eastfield. | SLS/194802 |
12/07/1952 | BR Standard Clans | The 'Clan' class engine is not appearing so regularly on the Stranraer road. Recently an ex-LM 5XP had to be assisted by ex-CR 18in. 0-6-0 from Girvan to Stranraer, the small engine doing most of the work, and ran almost to time. On 19/7 the 8.49 from Milngavie appeared for one day only in a new role. Made up of nine corridor vehicles hauled by 61067 (B1) it became a through train to London (K.X.). The S.O.C.T.A.C. special Craigendoran-Sheffield is worked by both B1 and ex-LM '5' 4-6-0 to Edinburgh. The Lauder branch is to be kept open meantime and class 2 2-6-0 engines are in use. Several lines are expecting the economy axe to fall shortly, both in Angus and the Coalbum and Strathaven branches in Lanarkshire. On 2/8 the 1.40 p.m. S.O. Glasgow to Largs, failed at Dalry. No. 40629 was taken from the train, which went forward half an hour late behind 90505. J37 64577 ran through the buffer stops at Leuchars on 29/7 and lay alongside the roadway until removed late that evening. Traffic working on the Ayr to Stranraer section during the summer has been fairly stereotyped. Trains to Girvan were worked by LM Compound, class 2 4-4-0, LM 2-6-4T and B.R. 2-6-4T (42206 and 80025 respectively), trains to Stranraer were generally hauled by ex-LM Class 5 4-6-0, with an occasional 5XP or Patriot, and a 'Clan' most days. There was one only ex-LM 2-6-0 seen on this section on goods work. Generally ex-LM 4-6-0 class 5 dealt with this traffic. Ex-CR 0-6-0T 56234 was pier pilot at Stranraer. 'Patriot' was always 45518 Bradshaw. |
SLS/195210 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/08/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1067 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25823 Allocated to Kittybrewster (KIT) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
15/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Special) - Arr: 15/01/1947. Dep: 18/01/1947. Work undertaken: Tablet catcher apparatus fitted |
||
27/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1947. Dep: 05/12/1947. | ||
13/11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61067 | ||
01/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/04/1949. Dep: 23/04/1949. | ||
25/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
01/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
08/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 08/03/1950. Dep: 30/03/1950. | ||
21/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1950. Dep: 19/01/1951. | ||
04/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
18/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
09/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/06/1951. Dep: 30/06/1951. | ||
25/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/11/1951. Dep: 12/12/1951. | ||
03/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1953. Dep: 03/11/1953. | ||
28/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1953. Dep: 06/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28661 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/03/1956. Dep: 14/04/1956. Work undertaken: Water pick-up apparatus removed |
||
18/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1956. Dep: 26/10/1956. | ||
18/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/06/1957. Dep: 22/06/1957. | ||
28/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/02/1958. Dep: 22/03/1958. | ||
17/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/12/1958. Dep: 14/01/1959. | ||
28/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1959. Dep: 10/04/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
19/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1960. Dep: 19/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28635 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61067 from Parkhead (65C) | ||
01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |