|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 27/11/1947 | 23/01/1948 | 58 days | General | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1068 |
||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1949 | 14/10/1949 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 9678 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61068 |
||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1951 | 23/06/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28217 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1953 | 09/05/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28210 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1953 | 12/05/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1953 | 04/12/1953 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1955 | 18/02/1955 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28456 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/02/1955 | 01/03/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1956 | 10/04/1956 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1956 | 08/11/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28417 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1958 | 01/08/1958 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28400 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1959 | 17/03/1959 | 13 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1960 | 18/02/1960 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1961 | 07/11/1961 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28348 (Diagram 100A) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
10/03/1963 | Ardsley MPD (Stored) | Stored at Ardsley on 10th March-60036/69/70/7/80/92/125, 61068/310, 64719/49/54/6/60/96/859/79/86/911/8/69, 67742/63/5/6/77. | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Washingborough Junction (Stored) | The Washingborough Junc.- Pelham St. Junc, section of the Boston-Lincoln line has been taken out of use; trains now use the former avoiding line from Washingborough Junc. (s.b. now closed) to Greetwell Junc. and the GN/GE Joint line thence to Lincoln Central. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/08/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1068 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25824 Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
27/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1947. Dep: 23/01/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1068 |
||
16/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
22/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
16/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1949. Dep: 14/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9678 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61068 |
||
29/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28217 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1953. Dep: 09/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28210 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/05/1953. Dep: 12/05/1953. | ||
20/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1953. Dep: 04/12/1953. | ||
14/02/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
27/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1955. Dep: 18/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28456 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/02/1955. Dep: 01/03/1955. | ||
27/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/03/1956. Dep: 10/04/1956. | ||
08/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1956. Dep: 08/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28417 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1958. Dep: 01/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28400 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1959. Dep: 17/03/1959. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
18/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 18/02/1960. Dep: 18/02/1960. | ||
27/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
03/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
12/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1961. Dep: 07/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28348 (Diagram 100A) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
25/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
17/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61068 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
02/07/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |