|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 30/08/1905 | 02/09/1905 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1948 | 26/02/1948 | 56 days | General | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1069 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/05/1948 | 29/05/1948 | 29 days | Light Repair | After collision Renumbered to BR 61069 |
||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1949 | 14/05/1949 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1949 | 25/05/1949 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/10/1949 | 05/11/1949 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3772 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1949 | 10/11/1949 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1949 | 08/12/1949 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 18/06/1951 | 10/07/1951 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28218 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/10/1951 | 04/10/1951 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1952 | 27/09/1952 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 28448 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1952 | 30/09/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1953 | 18/06/1953 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1953 | 08/07/1953 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1953 | 07/10/1953 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1954 | 13/03/1954 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28233 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1954 | 17/03/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1954 | 25/03/1954 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1954 | 02/04/1954 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1954 | 10/04/1954 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/07/1955 | 28/09/1955 | 70 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/06/1956 | 10/08/1956 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28453 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1958 | 18/04/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28551 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1958 | 08/12/1958 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1960 | 18/03/1960 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28125 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1962 | 06/12/1962 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28801 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1962 | 20/12/1962 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1963 | 19/08/1963 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Darlington Works | New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) | SLS/194804 |
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
28/02/1954 | Darlington Works | North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. | SLS/195404 |
20/08/1954 | Midland Compound oil-burners | We have been informed that a number of Midland Compound 4-4-0 engines were converted to oil-burning during the coal strike of 1926. From research in the official records it appears that 65 compounds were thus converted of which 40 are known: 1000, 1005, 1008, 1011, 1025, 1032, 1036, 1038, 1041, 1043, 1048-50, 1054, 1055, 1059, 1060, 1066, 1069, 1071, 1080, 1098-1100, 1107. 1120, 1121, 1123-28, 1131, 1136, 1139, 1149, 1164, 1168, 1179. The remaining 25 were converted under order 6682 (1926) but no numbers of individual engines are quoted in the records. | SLS/195410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/08/1905 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1905. Dep: 02/09/1905. | ||
26/08/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1069 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25825 Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
02/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1948. Dep: 26/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1069 |
||
01/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/05/1948. Dep: 29/05/1948. Work undertaken: After collision Renumbered to BR 61069 |
||
26/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/04/1949. Dep: 14/05/1949. | ||
16/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/05/1949. Dep: 25/05/1949. | ||
07/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1949. Dep: 05/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3772 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/11/1949. Dep: 10/11/1949. | ||
22/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/11/1949. Dep: 08/12/1949. | ||
18/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1951. Dep: 10/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28218 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/10/1951. Dep: 04/10/1951. | ||
08/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1952. Dep: 27/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28448 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1952. Dep: 30/09/1952. | ||
10/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1953. Dep: 18/06/1953. | ||
01/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/07/1953. Dep: 08/07/1953. | ||
25/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/09/1953. Dep: 07/10/1953. | ||
18/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1954. Dep: 13/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28233 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/03/1954. Dep: 17/03/1954. | ||
25/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 25/03/1954. Dep: 25/03/1954. | ||
27/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/03/1954. Dep: 02/04/1954. | ||
05/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/04/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954. | ||
21/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/07/1955. Dep: 28/09/1955. | ||
28/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1956. Dep: 10/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28453 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1958. Dep: 18/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28551 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 08/12/1958. Dep: 08/12/1958. | ||
25/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
16/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1960. Dep: 18/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28125 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
02/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1962. Dep: 06/12/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28801 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/12/1962. Dep: 20/12/1962. | ||
19/08/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 19/08/1963. Dep: 19/08/1963. | ||
26/08/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61069 from York (North) (50A) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |