Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 486 Today
» 1118 Yesterday
» 4122 Week
» 23767 Month
» 58409 Year
» 1279974 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1072   07/09/1946
BR (Tmp) E1072   06/03/1948
BR 61072   12/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L958
Works Number 25828
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Mon 07/09/1946 to Eastfield (EFD)
Withdrawal Mon 01/05/1967 off Dundee West (62B)
Scrapping Fri 14/07/1967 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 20 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Sold 14/7/67 for scrap to Motherwell Machinery & Scrap Co Wishaw

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield (New) 07/09/1946
HAY Haymarket 21/09/1946
THJ Thornton Junction 28/03/1948
62C Dunfermline Upper 25/08/1958
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 06/11/1966
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 04/12/1966
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 06/01/1967
   Withdrawn 01/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 12/11/1966
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 31/12/1966
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 5w/e 04/02/1967
WDN   01/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/09/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 3693)
21/03/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28614)
28/08/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28706)
04/11/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28873)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Cowlairs Works 22/03/1947 23/03/1947 2 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 20/01/1948 06/03/1948 47 days General
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E1072
 
Cowlairs Works 30/12/1949 21/01/1950 23 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 13/02/1952 21/03/1952 38 days General
Boiler number 28614 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 05/08/1953 08/08/1953 4 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 24/03/1954 24/04/1954 32 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 18/07/1956 28/08/1956 42 days General
Boiler number 28706 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 23/05/1958 14/06/1958 23 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 17/07/1958 18/07/1958 2 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 22/06/1959 30/06/1959 9 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 04/10/1960 04/11/1960 32 days General
Boiler number 28873 (Diagram 100A)
 
Cowlairs Works 24/12/1962 19/01/1963 27 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 15/04/1966 07/05/1966 23 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/09/1946 To Service To service as LNER Number 1072
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25828
Allocated to Eastfield (EFD)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
21/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
22/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/03/1947. Dep: 23/03/1947.    
20/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1948. Dep: 06/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E1072
   
28/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ)    
12/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61072    
30/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/12/1949. Dep: 21/01/1950.    
13/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1952. Dep: 21/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28614 (Diagram 100A)
   
05/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1953. Dep: 08/08/1953.    
24/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/03/1954. Dep: 24/04/1954.    
04/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/01/1955. Dep: 15/01/1955.    
16/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/05/1955. Dep: 21/06/1955.    
18/07/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1956. Dep: 28/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28706 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/05/1958. Dep: 14/06/1958.    
17/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/07/1958. Dep: 18/07/1958.    
25/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
22/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1959. Dep: 30/06/1959.    
04/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1960. Dep: 04/11/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28873 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/12/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/12/1962. Dep: 19/01/1963.    
15/04/1966 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/04/1966. Dep: 07/05/1966.    
06/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
04/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
06/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
01/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 61072 from Dundee West (62B)    
14/07/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev