|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1948 | 26/02/1948 | 39 days | General | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1073 |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1949 | 03/03/1949 | 18 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 61073 |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/11/1949 | 04/01/1950 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 9931 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1951 | 14/12/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28160 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1952 | 30/10/1952 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/07/1953 | 13/08/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28315 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1953 | 21/10/1953 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1955 | 15/04/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28529 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1957 | 11/04/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28156 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1959 | 13/02/1959 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28803 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/04/1960 | 03/05/1960 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1961 | 01/04/1961 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28153 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/09/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1073 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25829 Allocated to Eastfield (EFD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
16/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
04/05/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
19/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1948. Dep: 26/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1073 |
||
14/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1949. Dep: 03/03/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61073 |
||
29/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1949. Dep: 04/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9931 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1951. Dep: 14/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28160 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/10/1952. Dep: 30/10/1952. | ||
16/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1953. Dep: 13/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28315 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/10/1953. Dep: 21/10/1953. | ||
21/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1955. Dep: 15/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28529 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1957. Dep: 11/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28156 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1959. Dep: 13/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28803 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/04/1960. Dep: 03/05/1960. | ||
03/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1961. Dep: 01/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28153 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61073 from New England (34E) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by R A Kings: Norwich |