|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1948 | 12/05/1948 | 38 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61075 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1949 | 20/01/1949 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1950 | 08/06/1950 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 9886 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1951 | 21/12/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28162 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1953 | 02/10/1953 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28352 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1955 | 11/06/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28875 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1957 | 16/03/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28150 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1959 | 19/03/1959 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 28156 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1961 | 30/09/1961 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28405 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Weigh House) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/09/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1075 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25831 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
09/05/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
05/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1948. Dep: 12/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61075 |
||
18/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/01/1949. Dep: 20/01/1949. | ||
08/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1950. Dep: 08/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9886 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1951. Dep: 21/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28162 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1953. Dep: 02/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28352 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
11/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1955. Dep: 11/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28875 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1957. Dep: 16/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28150 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1959. Dep: 19/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28156 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
26/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1961. Dep: 30/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28405 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61075 from Mexborough (41F) | ||
12/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hesslewoods: Attercliffe |