|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1948 | 07/05/1948 | 47 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61077 |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1950 | 10/07/1950 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3716 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1952 | 18/03/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28181 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/09/1953 | 08/10/1953 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28199 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1955 | 18/03/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28296 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1956 | 17/08/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28324 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1958 | 08/03/1958 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28305 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1959 | 23/10/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28170 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1959 | 02/11/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/07/1960 | 10/12/1960 | 144 days | Light Casual | Collision damage - Tender rebuilt |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/08/1957 | Aylesbury | Following the withdrawal of the Watlington branch passenger services, the daily freight working is worked by Aylesbury (34E). The branch is no longer the responsibility of Slough (81B). One of the two Neasden J15's (65390, 65404) is stabled here at fortnightly intervals for this duty. On 18th August, Aylesbury shed housed 1473, 5424, 61028/77, 65390, 67752, 76037 an 80143. The two W.R. locomotives regularly shedded here (1473, 5409) are washed out at Banbury which supplies replacements when this is being done. | SLS/195709 |
31/12/1961 | Leicester GC | V2s 60815/50/63/90 have been placed in store and replaced by Bls 61077/1177/1206. B1 61381 an 40167 are also in store here. | SLS/196201 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/09/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1077 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25833 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
18/05/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
22/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1948. Dep: 07/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61077 |
||
04/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1950. Dep: 10/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3716 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1952. Dep: 18/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28181 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1953. Dep: 08/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28199 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1955. Dep: 18/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28296 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1956. Dep: 17/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28324 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1958. Dep: 08/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28305 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1959. Dep: 23/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28170 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/10/1959. Dep: 02/11/1959. | ||
20/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/07/1960. Dep: 10/12/1960. Work undertaken: Collision damage - Tender rebuilt |
||
13/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
21/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
14/05/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61077 from Gorton (9G) | ||
21/06/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |