|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 16/02/1948 | 27/03/1948 | 41 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61081 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/08/1949 | 26/08/1949 | 26 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/09/1951 | 20/11/1951 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 28616 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 30/12/1953 | 08/01/1954 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
R & W Hawthorn | 25/01/1954 | 05/02/1954 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/04/1954 | 08/05/1954 | 24 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/09/1955 | 15/10/1955 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28659 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/07/1956 | 04/08/1956 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
R & W Hawthorn | 18/03/1957 | 21/03/1957 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/08/1957 | 28/08/1957 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/09/1957 | 09/10/1957 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/05/1959 | 13/06/1959 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28665 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/08/1960 | 23/09/1960 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/05/1962 | 05/07/1962 | 36 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/07/1962 | 01/08/1962 | 23 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
27/08/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. | SLS/194910 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/10/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1081 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25837 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
16/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1948. Dep: 27/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61081 |
||
01/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/08/1949. Dep: 26/08/1949. | ||
21/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1951. Dep: 20/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28616 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/12/1953. Dep: 08/01/1954. | ||
25/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/01/1954. Dep: 05/02/1954. | ||
15/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 15/04/1954. Dep: 08/05/1954. | ||
13/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1955. Dep: 15/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28659 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/07/1956. Dep: 04/08/1956. | ||
18/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/03/1957. Dep: 21/03/1957. | ||
20/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/08/1957. Dep: 28/08/1957. | ||
06/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/09/1957. Dep: 09/10/1957. | ||
23/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1959. Dep: 13/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28665 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
19/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/08/1960. Dep: 23/09/1960. | ||
31/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 31/05/1962. Dep: 05/07/1962. | ||
10/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/07/1962. Dep: 01/08/1962. | ||
09/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
18/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
15/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61081 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |