|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1948 | 23/07/1948 | 49 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61083 |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1950 | 21/04/1950 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3712 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1951 | 26/10/1951 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28154 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1953 | 20/05/1953 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28752 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/11/1954 | 22/12/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28276 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1956 | 07/07/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28100 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 02/06/1958 | 01/08/1958 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 28515 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1960 | 12/01/1961 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28952 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/06/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works on 26/6 included; Nos. 1, 29, 30/6/9, 65/7, 104, 518, 818/83, 1083, 1128, 1800/24, 2821, 60042/49/97, 60515, 60870, 61830. The first of the new 'A.1' 4-6-2's No. 60114, was nearing completion here in early July and was being proceeded with faster than No. 60539. | SLS/194808 |
31/03/1950 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 60020/43/54, 60133/41, 60512/39, 60820/65/67, 61083, 61634, 61822/24/61, 61947/85, 67713/24, 69444, 69505. A considerable number of 'Pacific' and 'V.2' Class locomotives are being fitted with A.T.C. gear, as part of the ex-G.N. main line has already been equipped with A.T.C. apparatus; this may be extended. | SLS/195005 |
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
31/12/1961 | Millhouses closure | Millhouses M.P.D. (41C) was closed as from 31/12/61 and its allocation of locomotives distributed as follows : 41209/45/6, 43037, 45570/6/90/4, 45602/7/27/54/6/64/83/725, 45536, 46131/47/8/51/4, 46450, 61083/93, 61820/2, 73016/65/155 all to Canklow (41D); 78022/3/4/5 to Doncaster (36A). | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/10/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1083 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25838 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
16/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
05/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1948. Dep: 23/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61083 |
||
03/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1950. Dep: 21/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3712 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1951. Dep: 26/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28154 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1953. Dep: 20/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28752 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1954. Dep: 22/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28276 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1956. Dep: 07/07/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28100 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
02/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1958. Dep: 01/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28515 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
24/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
12/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1960. Dep: 12/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28952 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61083 from Canklow (41D) | ||
12/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Marples and Gillot: Sheffield |