|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 14/04/1948 | 14/05/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3684 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61084 |
||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1948 | 28/05/1948 | 11 days | Unclassified | Special painting |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1950 | 27/05/1950 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 9775 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1952 | 25/04/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28419 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/02/1954 | 27/02/1954 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28155 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1954 | 02/03/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1956 | 20/02/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28319 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/02/1956 | 06/03/1956 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1957 | 29/08/1957 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1958 | 14/05/1958 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28434 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1959 | 06/07/1959 | 13 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1960 | 22/10/1960 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28524 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1954 | Darlington Works | North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. | SLS/195404 |
20/03/1954 | York Excursions | On 20/3/54 three excursion trains were run from York to Warrington for an important Rugby League match, the first train travelling via Leeds and the following two via Normanton; they were hauled respectively by 61224, 61084 an 61176 (all 50A). On 27/3/54 61224 (50A) worked the York portion of a North Eastern Region special dining excursion for the Grand National at Aintree, leaving York at 8.45 a.m. On 28/4/54 43133 (65A) was noted at York about 2.30 p.m. working a train of empties from Hull to Heaton. 60007 (34A) failed at Thirsk on 23/4/54 whilst working the Up Tees-Tyne Pullman, 9.25 a.m. Newcastle to King's Cross. It was replaced by 60981, the York south end pilot, which ran out light to Thirsk with the minimum of delay. In the evening 60007 was hauled into York shed by 61035 (50B). |
SLS/195406 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington Works (Yard) | New Engine Shop: D3940, 12116, tender of 60530. Main Erecting shop: 60530 Sayajirao, 60844, 61214, 61330, 62059, 73095, 73132, 76095/9, 93368/610, D2246/72, D3657. Yard Paint shop: 60118 Archibald Sturrock. Yard: 43008 an 62041 being painted, 60522 Straight Deal, 60145 Saint Mungo, 60011 frames only, 61038 without nameplates, 61084, 63393, 65033/99, 43123, 44734, 68062, D2700, 90407; North Rd. scrap yard: 61229, 61321 and tender of 60020. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/10/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1084 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25841 Allocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
14/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1948. Dep: 14/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3684 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61084 |
||
16/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
18/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/05/1948. Dep: 28/05/1948. Work undertaken: Special painting |
||
22/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
01/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1950. Dep: 27/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9775 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1952. Dep: 25/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28419 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1954. Dep: 27/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28155 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/03/1954. Dep: 02/03/1954. | ||
20/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1956. Dep: 20/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28319 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/02/1956. Dep: 06/03/1956. | ||
22/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/08/1957. Dep: 29/08/1957. | ||
17/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1958. Dep: 14/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28434 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1959. Dep: 06/07/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
14/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1960. Dep: 22/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28524 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61084 from York (North) (50A) | ||
07/09/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |