|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 20/06/1948 | 04/08/1948 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 9443 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61085 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/06/1950 | 21/07/1950 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 9933 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1952 | 12/09/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28272 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1954 | 30/11/1954 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28586 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1956 | 08/02/1956 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1957 | 05/06/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28125 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1958 | 15/01/1959 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1959 | 15/10/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28280 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1960 | 22/12/1960 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1961 | 05/10/1961 | 36 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/12/1965 | Doncaster MPD | Stored: 61085, 61135, 61326, 63738, 90203/59/77, 90349/93, 90432/54/76, 90501/16/28, 90629, 92190. | SLS/196601 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/10/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1085 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25842 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
02/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
09/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
20/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1948. Dep: 04/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9443 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61085 |
||
04/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
17/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
20/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1950. Dep: 21/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9933 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
20/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1952. Dep: 12/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28272 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
03/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1954. Dep: 30/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28586 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
24/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/01/1956. Dep: 08/02/1956. | ||
08/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1957. Dep: 05/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28125 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
08/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/12/1958. Dep: 15/01/1959. | ||
09/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1959. Dep: 15/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28280 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
06/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
08/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/11/1960. Dep: 22/12/1960. | ||
31/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/08/1961. Dep: 05/10/1961. | ||
27/11/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61085 from Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
07/12/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |