|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/07/1948 | 04/09/1948 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 9682 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61088 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/07/1950 | 19/08/1950 | 30 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1951 | 10/01/1952 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1953 | 28/02/1953 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28293 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1953 | 03/03/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1954 | 04/01/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28568 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1955 | 24/02/1955 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1956 | 11/12/1956 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1957 | 07/06/1957 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28900 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/06/1957 | 24/06/1957 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1959 | 09/04/1959 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28183 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1959 | 08/07/1959 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1960 | 18/02/1960 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1960 | 30/09/1960 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/07/1961 | 12/08/1961 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28814 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/10/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1088 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25844 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
19/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1948. Dep: 04/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9682 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61088 |
||
13/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
19/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
03/04/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
09/04/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
19/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
25/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
12/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
18/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
21/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1950. Dep: 19/08/1950. | ||
09/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/12/1951. Dep: 10/01/1952. | ||
06/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28293 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1953. Dep: 03/03/1953. | ||
06/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1954. Dep: 04/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28568 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/02/1955. Dep: 24/02/1955. | ||
18/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
05/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/12/1956. Dep: 11/12/1956. | ||
14/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1957. Dep: 07/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28900 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/06/1957. Dep: 24/06/1957. | ||
02/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1959. Dep: 09/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28183 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/06/1959. Dep: 08/07/1959. | ||
09/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/02/1960. Dep: 18/02/1960. | ||
21/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/09/1960. Dep: 30/09/1960. | ||
15/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1961. Dep: 12/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28814 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61088 from Colwick (40E) | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |