Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 761 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3447 Week
» 4337 Month
» 312318 Year
» 1196699 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1088   18/10/1946
BR 61088   04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L958
Works Number 25844
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Sun 18/10/1946 to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Withdrawal Sun 22/09/1963 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During 01/1964 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 16 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap 1/64 to J Cashmore, Great Bridge

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Darnall (New) 18/10/1946
WFD Woodford Halse 27/04/1947
LEI Leicester (G.C.) 13/03/1949
WFD Woodford Halse 03/04/1949
CLK Colwick 19/06/1949
38C Leicester (G.C.) 12/03/1950
38A Colwick 18/11/1956
   Withdrawn 22/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW SHF Sheffield Darnall 18/10/1946
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse 27/04/1947
ALLOC LEI Leicester (G.C.) w/e 19/03/1949
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse w/e 09/04/1949
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 25/06/1949
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) w/e 18/03/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 3w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   22/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
18/10/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9683)
04/09/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9682)
28/02/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28293)
04/01/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28568)
07/06/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28900)
09/04/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28183)
12/08/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28814)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 19/07/1948 04/09/1948 48 days General
Boiler number 9682 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61088
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1950 19/08/1950 30 days General  
Darlington Works 09/12/1951 10/01/1952 33 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 06/02/1953 28/02/1953 23 days General
Boiler number 28293 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 02/03/1953 03/03/1953 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/12/1954 04/01/1955 30 days General
Boiler number 28568 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 11/02/1955 24/02/1955 14 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 05/12/1956 11/12/1956 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/05/1957 07/06/1957 25 days General
Boiler number 28900 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 18/06/1957 24/06/1957 7 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 02/03/1959 09/04/1959 39 days General
Boiler number 28183 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 19/06/1959 08/07/1959 20 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 09/02/1960 18/02/1960 10 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 21/09/1960 30/09/1960 10 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 15/07/1961 12/08/1961 29 days General
Boiler number 28814 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/10/1946 To Service To service as LNER Number 1088
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25844
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
19/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1948. Dep: 04/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9682 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 61088
   
13/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
03/04/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
19/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
12/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
21/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1950. Dep: 19/08/1950.    
09/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/12/1951. Dep: 10/01/1952.    
06/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28293 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1953. Dep: 03/03/1953.    
06/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1954. Dep: 04/01/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28568 (Diagram 100A)
   
11/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/02/1955. Dep: 24/02/1955.    
18/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
05/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/12/1956. Dep: 11/12/1956.    
14/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1957. Dep: 07/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28900 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/06/1957. Dep: 24/06/1957.    
02/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1959. Dep: 09/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28183 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/06/1959. Dep: 08/07/1959.    
09/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/02/1960. Dep: 18/02/1960.    
21/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/09/1960. Dep: 30/09/1960.    
15/07/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1961. Dep: 12/08/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28814 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 61088 from Colwick (40E)    
01/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev