|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1948 | 24/12/1948 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 9713 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61090 |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1950 | 04/12/1950 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28115 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1952 | 24/12/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28131 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 20/09/1954 | 29/10/1954 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28518 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1957 | 29/11/1957 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28116 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1960 | 22/04/1960 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28221 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1960 | 22/08/1960 | 21 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | General | New 'B.1' 4-6-0's, Nos. 1089-99, etc. (from 1094 they are green), are much in evidence on outer suburban, Hitchin' etc., workings at King's Cross. Scottish visitors seen there before Christmas were: Blue 'A.4' 4, William Whitelaw, and 'V.2' 834 (late 4805), both of Haymarket. Gateshead or Heaton 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' often get through to London. N.E., G.C., and G.E. locos. still appear from time to time on G.N. freight, parcel or similar trains. The G.E. principal express workings to Liverpool Street (including the East Anglian) from Norwich are regularly operated by the new standard 2-cyl. 4-6-0's, with drivers keeping their own loco. as far as possible. These excellent engines are on other G.E. as well as G.C. fast passenger turns also. | SLS/194702 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/10/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1090 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25846 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
07/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1948. Dep: 24/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9713 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61090 |
||
01/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1950. Dep: 04/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28115 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1952. Dep: 24/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28131 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1954. Dep: 29/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28518 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1957. Dep: 29/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28116 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
21/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1960. Dep: 22/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28221 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
02/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/08/1960. Dep: 22/08/1960. | ||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
22/09/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61090 from Mexborough (41F) |