|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1947 | 18/08/1947 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1948 | 14/01/1949 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 5091 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61091 |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1950 | 06/12/1950 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28117 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1952 | 25/09/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28512 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1953 | 26/03/1953 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 25/01/1954 | 06/02/1954 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1954 | 01/10/1954 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28833 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1956 | 29/08/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28584 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 13/10/1958 | 21/11/1958 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28410 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1960 | 31/08/1960 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1962 | 22/08/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | General | New 'B.1' 4-6-0's, Nos. 1089-99, etc. (from 1094 they are green), are much in evidence on outer suburban, Hitchin' etc., workings at King's Cross. Scottish visitors seen there before Christmas were: Blue 'A.4' 4, William Whitelaw, and 'V.2' 834 (late 4805), both of Haymarket. Gateshead or Heaton 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' often get through to London. N.E., G.C., and G.E. locos. still appear from time to time on G.N. freight, parcel or similar trains. The G.E. principal express workings to Liverpool Street (including the East Anglian) from Norwich are regularly operated by the new standard 2-cyl. 4-6-0's, with drivers keeping their own loco. as far as possible. These excellent engines are on other G.E. as well as G.C. fast passenger turns also. | SLS/194702 |
17/08/1947 | Doncaster Works | On 17/8 the following withdrawn locos. (still complete) were in the Works yard: 'D3' 2127/42/47; 'D2' 2171/86/91/96; 'Cl' 2800/12; '03' 3490/92; 'J3' 4155; 'C12' 7396 and Railcars R51909/13; whilst the following: 'D3' 2123, 'D2' 2181 and 'Dl' 2203 were observed stripped. Locos. awaiting Works or scrapping were: 'Bl' 1091, 'D3' 2139, 'D2' 2170/73, 'J3' 4121 and 'J55' 8319. W.D. No. 77003 was noted in the Erecting Shop. | SLS/194710 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/10/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1091 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25847 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
30/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/07/1947. Dep: 18/08/1947. | ||
05/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1948. Dep: 14/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5091 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61091 |
||
07/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1950. Dep: 06/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28117 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1952. Dep: 25/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28512 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/03/1953. Dep: 26/03/1953. | ||
25/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/01/1954. Dep: 06/02/1954. | ||
26/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1954. Dep: 01/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28833 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1956. Dep: 29/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28584 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1958. Dep: 21/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28410 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/08/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
18/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1960. Dep: 31/08/1960. | ||
22/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/08/1962. Dep: 22/08/1962. | ||
09/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
10/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61091 from New England (34E) |