|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1949 | 30/03/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 9827 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61095 |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1950 | 02/05/1950 | 31 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1951 | 11/04/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28136 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/02/1953 | 23/03/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28529 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1953 | 17/10/1953 | 3 days | Special | Tender change |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/02/1955 | 25/03/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28272 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1957 | 05/07/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28236 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 06/04/1959 | 21/05/1959 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28841 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1961 | 09/06/1961 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28349 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/02/1963 | 05/03/1963 | 30 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28241 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/12/1946 | Queens Park Works | A further nine new 'B.1' Class locos were ex. Queen's Park Works as follows:-1093 1/11, 1094 6/11, 1095 11/11, 1096 13/11, 1097 w/e 16/11, 1098/9 w/e 23/11, 1100 26/11, 1101 w/e 30/11, and 1102 2/12. 1093-1101 carry works numbers 25849-57 (all checked). On the same date 1103 (25863) and 1104 (25864) were in the Paint Shop, whilst in the Erecting Shop were 1105-1109; 1105/6 were completed and the latter undergoing steam test. The other three were in an advanced state of construction. The green engines have the numbers on the cab sides in 'Gill Sans' style, but they and the lettering on the tender are not in pre-war shaded gilt, but in plain yellow, with a thin black line all round, about &nfrac18;' thick! The black engines of the series have yellow letters with red shading | SLS/194701 |
31/12/1946 | General | New 'B.1' 4-6-0's, Nos. 1089-99, etc. (from 1094 they are green), are much in evidence on outer suburban, Hitchin' etc., workings at King's Cross. Scottish visitors seen there before Christmas were: Blue 'A.4' 4, William Whitelaw, and 'V.2' 834 (late 4805), both of Haymarket. Gateshead or Heaton 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' often get through to London. N.E., G.C., and G.E. locos. still appear from time to time on G.N. freight, parcel or similar trains. The G.E. principal express workings to Liverpool Street (including the East Anglian) from Norwich are regularly operated by the new standard 2-cyl. 4-6-0's, with drivers keeping their own loco. as far as possible. These excellent engines are on other G.E. as well as G.C. fast passenger turns also. | SLS/194702 |
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
01/02/1960 | Peterborough Midland Closure | Peterborough Midland (31F) closed as from 1st February and the engines were transferred as follows-to March D2239, 11156/7, 41949, 44152/273, 44509/21, 47300, 61095/6, 61156/204/5/323/48, 62613, 64789, 64901, 90063/447/501/28. To New England (34E) 43127; Grimesthorpe (41B) 44097/518; remainder returned to LMR viz. 43957, 44110/239/47/476/519/22. | SLS/196003 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
09/09/1963 | Lincoln MPD | The allocation of D1531/2/3/4 to Darnall has released Brush d/es D5801/2/3/53/4 for work at Lincoln and eventual elimination of steam but on 9th September the steam allocation was-43086/95/104/5/49, 61006/26/41/2/58/89/95/107/13/62/223/58/348/84/409, 90223/460/577. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/11/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1095 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25851 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
27/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1949. Dep: 30/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9827 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61095 |
||
02/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/04/1950. Dep: 02/05/1950. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
14/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1951. Dep: 11/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28136 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1953. Dep: 23/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28529 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
15/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 15/10/1953. Dep: 17/10/1953. Work undertaken: Tender change |
||
28/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1955. Dep: 25/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28272 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
28/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1957. Dep: 05/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28236 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1959. Dep: 21/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28841 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
10/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1961. Dep: 09/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28349 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
04/02/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
20/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
04/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1963. Dep: 05/03/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28241 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61095 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |