|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 16/06/1948 | 17/07/1948 | 32 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61102 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 31/10/1950 | 16/12/1950 | 47 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/10/1952 | 08/11/1952 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 28617 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/02/1954 | 13/03/1954 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/01/1955 | 19/02/1955 | 32 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/02/1956 | 14/04/1956 | 48 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1956 | 02/06/1956 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/08/1958 | 13/09/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28619 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/10/1959 | 16/10/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/02/1961 | 18/03/1961 | 39 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/12/1962 | 26/01/1963 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28844 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/06/1964 | 27/06/1964 | 23 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/12/1946 | Queens Park Works | A further nine new 'B.1' Class locos were ex. Queen's Park Works as follows:-1093 1/11, 1094 6/11, 1095 11/11, 1096 13/11, 1097 w/e 16/11, 1098/9 w/e 23/11, 1100 26/11, 1101 w/e 30/11, and 1102 2/12. 1093-1101 carry works numbers 25849-57 (all checked). On the same date 1103 (25863) and 1104 (25864) were in the Paint Shop, whilst in the Erecting Shop were 1105-1109; 1105/6 were completed and the latter undergoing steam test. The other three were in an advanced state of construction. The green engines have the numbers on the cab sides in 'Gill Sans' style, but they and the lettering on the tender are not in pre-war shaded gilt, but in plain yellow, with a thin black line all round, about &nfrac18;' thick! The black engines of the series have yellow letters with red shading | SLS/194701 |
31/12/1946 | Queens Park Works | During December twelve new Class 'B1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1102-1113 inclusive (74 in 8&nfrac12; months), No. 1111 being the N.B. Loco. Co.'s 'Christmas present' to the L.N.E.R.-it was ex Works on 25.12.46! No. 1112 was ex Works 27.12.46, and 1113 on either Mon-day 30th or Tuesday 31st, before the Works closed down for the New Year holidays. 1111 ran trials on 28/12, and on 4/1/47 was observed working the 2.25 p.m. Glasgow-Edinburgh train. Works Nos. checked are as follows: 1106 (25859/46), 1107 (26861/46), 1109 (25865/46), 1110 (25866/46), 1111 (25867/46), 1112 (25868/46). It will be noted there is further confusion. On 23/12 1114 was noted in Q.P. Works Erecting Shop with Works plates 25870/46, although 1113 had no plates fitted. The Maker's plates are not usually fitted until the engine is in the Paint Shop. On the above date up to 1116 (which only lacked wheels), were noted in the Works. 1111 and 1112 were in the Paint Shop. No. 6399 'D.11' 'Allan-Bane' was noted at Eastfleld on 2/1/47 still un-Renumbered. This must be one of the very few not yet renumbered in Scotland. The last one noted was 'J6' 9668 in Cowlairs Works Yard on 7/12/46, and 'V.2' 4819 on the same day. 9668 has since appeared as 5240. | SLS/194702 |
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (Stripping Pit) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
04/04/1949 | Eastfield MPD | On 4/4 No. 61102 was noted here in L.N.E.R. green. Works' No. 25862/46. | SLS/194905 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/12/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1102 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25862 Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
16/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1948. Dep: 17/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61102 |
||
31/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 31/10/1950. Dep: 16/12/1950. | ||
20/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28617 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1954. Dep: 13/03/1954. | ||
19/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/01/1955. Dep: 19/02/1955. | ||
27/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/02/1956. Dep: 14/04/1956. | ||
24/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/05/1956. Dep: 02/06/1956. | ||
16/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1958. Dep: 13/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28619 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/10/1959. Dep: 16/10/1959. | ||
08/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 08/02/1961. Dep: 18/03/1961. | ||
13/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1962. Dep: 26/01/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28844 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/06/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/06/1964. Dep: 27/06/1964. | ||
22/04/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61102 from Dundee West (62B) | ||
07/07/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by P.W. McLellan: Langloan |