|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1948 | 27/05/1948 | 27 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61106 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/04/1949 | 07/05/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 9774 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1950 | 01/04/1950 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1951 | 24/02/1951 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28291 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1951 | 05/03/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1951 | 14/03/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/12/1952 | 24/01/1953 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28269 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1954 | 20/11/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28205 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1957 | 15/08/1957 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28279 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1957 | 28/10/1957 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1959 | 08/08/1959 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 28270 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1960 | 24/12/1960 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28211 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | Queens Park Works | During December twelve new Class 'B1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1102-1113 inclusive (74 in 8&nfrac12; months), No. 1111 being the N.B. Loco. Co.'s 'Christmas present' to the L.N.E.R.-it was ex Works on 25.12.46! No. 1112 was ex Works 27.12.46, and 1113 on either Mon-day 30th or Tuesday 31st, before the Works closed down for the New Year holidays. 1111 ran trials on 28/12, and on 4/1/47 was observed working the 2.25 p.m. Glasgow-Edinburgh train. Works Nos. checked are as follows: 1106 (25859/46), 1107 (26861/46), 1109 (25865/46), 1110 (25866/46), 1111 (25867/46), 1112 (25868/46). It will be noted there is further confusion. On 23/12 1114 was noted in Q.P. Works Erecting Shop with Works plates 25870/46, although 1113 had no plates fitted. The Maker's plates are not usually fitted until the engine is in the Paint Shop. On the above date up to 1116 (which only lacked wheels), were noted in the Works. 1111 and 1112 were in the Paint Shop. No. 6399 'D.11' 'Allan-Bane' was noted at Eastfleld on 2/1/47 still un-Renumbered. This must be one of the very few not yet renumbered in Scotland. The last one noted was 'J6' 9668 in Cowlairs Works Yard on 7/12/46, and 'V.2' 4819 on the same day. 9668 has since appeared as 5240. | SLS/194702 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/12/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1106 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25859 Allocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
01/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1948. Dep: 27/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61106 |
||
23/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
04/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1949. Dep: 07/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9774 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
21/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
21/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/02/1950. Dep: 01/04/1950. | ||
10/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1951. Dep: 24/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28291 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/03/1951. Dep: 05/03/1951. | ||
13/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/03/1951. Dep: 14/03/1951. | ||
12/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
22/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1952. Dep: 24/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28269 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
28/02/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
16/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1954. Dep: 20/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28205 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1957. Dep: 15/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28279 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/10/1957. Dep: 28/10/1957. | ||
08/12/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
10/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1959. Dep: 08/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28270 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
28/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1960. Dep: 24/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28211 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61106 from Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
27/11/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |