|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/07/1948 | 28/08/1948 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61108 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1949 | 19/11/1949 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 9699 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1949 | 25/11/1949 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1951 | 12/12/1951 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28235 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 30/06/1953 | 08/08/1953 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28167 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/09/1955 | 22/10/1955 | 40 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/11/1955 | 12/11/1955 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/11/1957 | 14/12/1957 | 36 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/08/1958 | 13/09/1958 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28649 (Diagram 100A) |
||
St. Rollox Works | 30/03/1959 | 23/04/1959 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/09/1959 | 23/09/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/11/1960 | 30/12/1960 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | Queens Park Works | During December twelve new Class 'B1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1102-1113 inclusive (74 in 8&nfrac12; months), No. 1111 being the N.B. Loco. Co.'s 'Christmas present' to the L.N.E.R.-it was ex Works on 25.12.46! No. 1112 was ex Works 27.12.46, and 1113 on either Mon-day 30th or Tuesday 31st, before the Works closed down for the New Year holidays. 1111 ran trials on 28/12, and on 4/1/47 was observed working the 2.25 p.m. Glasgow-Edinburgh train. Works Nos. checked are as follows: 1106 (25859/46), 1107 (26861/46), 1109 (25865/46), 1110 (25866/46), 1111 (25867/46), 1112 (25868/46). It will be noted there is further confusion. On 23/12 1114 was noted in Q.P. Works Erecting Shop with Works plates 25870/46, although 1113 had no plates fitted. The Maker's plates are not usually fitted until the engine is in the Paint Shop. On the above date up to 1116 (which only lacked wheels), were noted in the Works. 1111 and 1112 were in the Paint Shop. No. 6399 'D.11' 'Allan-Bane' was noted at Eastfleld on 2/1/47 still un-Renumbered. This must be one of the very few not yet renumbered in Scotland. The last one noted was 'J6' 9668 in Cowlairs Works Yard on 7/12/46, and 'V.2' 4819 on the same day. 9668 has since appeared as 5240. | SLS/194702 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/12/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1108 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25860 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
08/05/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
19/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1948. Dep: 28/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61108 |
||
13/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
19/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
26/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1949. Dep: 19/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9699 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/11/1949. Dep: 25/11/1949. | ||
19/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1951. Dep: 12/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28235 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1953. Dep: 08/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28167 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
13/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 13/09/1955. Dep: 22/10/1955. | ||
08/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/11/1955. Dep: 12/11/1955. | ||
09/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/11/1957. Dep: 14/12/1957. | ||
23/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 23/08/1958. Dep: 13/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28649 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/03/1959. Dep: 23/04/1959. | ||
15/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/09/1959. Dep: 23/09/1959. | ||
22/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/11/1960. Dep: 30/12/1960. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61108 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |