|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 08/12/1947 | 19/01/1948 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1948 | 22/06/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3699 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61111 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/09/1948 | 08/09/1948 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1949 | 02/12/1949 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/12/1949 | 08/12/1949 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1951 | 01/09/1951 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 28814 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1951 | 14/09/1951 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1953 | 15/06/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28333 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/07/1953 | 17/07/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1954 | 15/05/1954 | 26 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1955 | 21/09/1955 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28213 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 19/12/1957 | 14/02/1958 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 28202 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1960 | 06/05/1960 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28397 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | Queens Park Works | During December twelve new Class 'B1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1102-1113 inclusive (74 in 8&nfrac12; months), No. 1111 being the N.B. Loco. Co.'s 'Christmas present' to the L.N.E.R.-it was ex Works on 25.12.46! No. 1112 was ex Works 27.12.46, and 1113 on either Mon-day 30th or Tuesday 31st, before the Works closed down for the New Year holidays. 1111 ran trials on 28/12, and on 4/1/47 was observed working the 2.25 p.m. Glasgow-Edinburgh train. Works Nos. checked are as follows: 1106 (25859/46), 1107 (26861/46), 1109 (25865/46), 1110 (25866/46), 1111 (25867/46), 1112 (25868/46). It will be noted there is further confusion. On 23/12 1114 was noted in Q.P. Works Erecting Shop with Works plates 25870/46, although 1113 had no plates fitted. The Maker's plates are not usually fitted until the engine is in the Paint Shop. On the above date up to 1116 (which only lacked wheels), were noted in the Works. 1111 and 1112 were in the Paint Shop. No. 6399 'D.11' 'Allan-Bane' was noted at Eastfleld on 2/1/47 still un-Renumbered. This must be one of the very few not yet renumbered in Scotland. The last one noted was 'J6' 9668 in Cowlairs Works Yard on 7/12/46, and 'V.2' 4819 on the same day. 9668 has since appeared as 5240. | SLS/194702 |
22/10/1959 | Leicester GC MPD | Only four Bls now remain viz. 61111/36, 61376/81; others having moved to Agecroft (26B) in exchange for LM Class 5s, the latest arrivals being 44932, 45116 (still with Sc. R. numbering), 45234 an 45450. | SLS/195912 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/12/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1111 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25867 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
01/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
08/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/12/1947. Dep: 19/01/1948. | ||
23/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1948. Dep: 22/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3699 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61111 |
||
02/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/09/1948. Dep: 08/09/1948. | ||
21/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
27/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1949. Dep: 02/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/12/1949. Dep: 08/12/1949. | ||
27/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1951. Dep: 01/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28814 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/09/1951. Dep: 14/09/1951. | ||
07/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
07/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
28/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
21/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1953. Dep: 15/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28333 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/07/1953. Dep: 17/07/1953. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
20/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1954. Dep: 15/05/1954. | ||
09/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
06/02/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
29/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1955. Dep: 21/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28213 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
02/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
27/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
10/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
08/06/1957 | Report | Report: "B1" No. 61111 (34E) was on Neville Hill shed. The "B1" had arrived with empty stock from Newcastle and that evening returned as pilot to "A4" No. 60096 (64B), ex-works and carrying a "CTAC Scottish Tours Express" headboard, on a 17-bogie haul of parcels vans. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) | ||
19/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1957. Dep: 14/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28202 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
24/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
08/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1960. Dep: 06/05/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28397 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61111 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |