|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 14/09/1948 | 15/10/1948 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 9715 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61112 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1951 | 28/04/1951 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28207 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1952 | 28/08/1952 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1953 | 20/02/1953 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28282 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1953 | 02/03/1953 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1955 | 28/01/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28119 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1957 | 18/04/1957 | 28 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1957 | 30/04/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1960 | 28/04/1960 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28199 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | Queens Park Works | During December twelve new Class 'B1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1102-1113 inclusive (74 in 8&nfrac12; months), No. 1111 being the N.B. Loco. Co.'s 'Christmas present' to the L.N.E.R.-it was ex Works on 25.12.46! No. 1112 was ex Works 27.12.46, and 1113 on either Mon-day 30th or Tuesday 31st, before the Works closed down for the New Year holidays. 1111 ran trials on 28/12, and on 4/1/47 was observed working the 2.25 p.m. Glasgow-Edinburgh train. Works Nos. checked are as follows: 1106 (25859/46), 1107 (26861/46), 1109 (25865/46), 1110 (25866/46), 1111 (25867/46), 1112 (25868/46). It will be noted there is further confusion. On 23/12 1114 was noted in Q.P. Works Erecting Shop with Works plates 25870/46, although 1113 had no plates fitted. The Maker's plates are not usually fitted until the engine is in the Paint Shop. On the above date up to 1116 (which only lacked wheels), were noted in the Works. 1111 and 1112 were in the Paint Shop. No. 6399 'D.11' 'Allan-Bane' was noted at Eastfleld on 2/1/47 still un-Renumbered. This must be one of the very few not yet renumbered in Scotland. The last one noted was 'J6' 9668 in Cowlairs Works Yard on 7/12/46, and 'V.2' 4819 on the same day. 9668 has since appeared as 5240. | SLS/194702 |
01/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives under repair here on 1/10 included Nos. 8, 37, 87, 98, 516/19, 1092, 1107/09/12/24, 60007/18/19/20/60, 60635 an 61120. | SLS/194811 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/12/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1112 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25868 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
14/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1948. Dep: 15/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9715 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61112 |
||
12/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
18/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
20/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
22/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
15/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1951. Dep: 28/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28207 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
03/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
27/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
11/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1952. Dep: 28/08/1952. | ||
27/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1953. Dep: 20/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28282 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1953. Dep: 02/03/1953. | ||
04/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
03/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1955. Dep: 28/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28119 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/03/1957. Dep: 18/04/1957. | ||
28/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/04/1957. Dep: 30/04/1957. | ||
24/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
23/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1960. Dep: 28/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28199 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
09/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61112 from Mexborough (41F) | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |