|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1947 | 15/01/1948 | 44 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1949 | 23/07/1949 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 9768 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61114 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1949 | 18/08/1949 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1951 | 29/03/1951 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1951 | 03/11/1951 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28816 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/11/1951 | 08/11/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1951 | 13/11/1951 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1951 | 16/11/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 10/02/1953 | 07/03/1953 | 26 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Stratford Works | 08/09/1953 | 10/10/1953 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28528 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1955 | 19/07/1955 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28876 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1957 | 24/08/1957 | 47 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1959 | 19/06/1959 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1959 | 03/12/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28568 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1961 | 22/08/1961 | 2 days | Weighing |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1947 | Queens Park Works | During January ten new Class 'B.1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1114-1123 inclusive; whilst during February a further ten appeared, viz., Nos. 1124-1133 inclusive. Works Nos. checked are as follows:, 1114-1118 (25870-4/46), 1120-1123 (25876-9/46), 1125-1133 (25881-9/46). | SLS/194705 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/01/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1114 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25870 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
03/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1947. Dep: 15/01/1948. | ||
07/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) | ||
19/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
21/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
13/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) | ||
23/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
08/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1949. Dep: 23/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9768 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61114 |
||
17/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/08/1949. Dep: 18/08/1949. | ||
28/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/03/1951. Dep: 29/03/1951. | ||
21/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1951. Dep: 03/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28816 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/11/1951. Dep: 08/11/1951. | ||
10/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1951. Dep: 13/11/1951. | ||
15/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/11/1951. Dep: 16/11/1951. | ||
05/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
10/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/02/1953. Dep: 07/03/1953. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
08/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1953. Dep: 10/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28528 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/02/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
15/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1955. Dep: 19/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28876 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/07/1957. Dep: 24/08/1957. | ||
06/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/06/1959. Dep: 19/06/1959. | ||
05/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1959. Dep: 03/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28568 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
21/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 21/08/1961. Dep: 22/08/1961. | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61114 from Immingham (40B) | ||
01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Ickles |