|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 08/06/1948 | 10/07/1948 | 33 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61116 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/01/1949 | 21/01/1949 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/04/1949 | 15/04/1949 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/03/1950 | 08/04/1950 | 17 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/09/1950 | 14/09/1950 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/07/1951 | 02/07/1951 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/07/1951 | 09/07/1951 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/01/1952 | 25/01/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/03/1952 | 09/04/1952 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28822 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 06/02/1954 | 19/03/1954 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 28540 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1955 | 01/10/1955 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28236 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1955 | 12/10/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1955 | 12/11/1955 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/04/1957 | 31/05/1957 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28133 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1958 | 28/02/1958 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 24/02/1959 | 24/04/1959 | 60 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 10/11/1959 | 25/11/1959 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1961 | 09/09/1961 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28154 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1947 | Queens Park Works | During January ten new Class 'B.1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1114-1123 inclusive; whilst during February a further ten appeared, viz., Nos. 1124-1133 inclusive. Works Nos. checked are as follows:, 1114-1118 (25870-4/46), 1120-1123 (25876-9/46), 1125-1133 (25881-9/46). | SLS/194705 |
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
02/04/1959 | Stratford Works (Old Works) | Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. | SLS/195905 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/01/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1116 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25872 Allocated to Eastfield (EFD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
08/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1948. Dep: 10/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61116 |
||
17/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/01/1949. Dep: 21/01/1949. | ||
15/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/04/1949. Dep: 15/04/1949. | ||
23/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/03/1950. Dep: 08/04/1950. | ||
14/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/09/1950. Dep: 14/09/1950. | ||
02/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/07/1951. Dep: 02/07/1951. | ||
09/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1951. Dep: 09/07/1951. | ||
22/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/01/1952. Dep: 25/01/1952. | ||
05/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1952. Dep: 09/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28822 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
06/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1954. Dep: 19/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28540 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1955. Dep: 01/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28236 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/10/1955. Dep: 12/10/1955. | ||
28/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/10/1955. Dep: 12/11/1955. | ||
18/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1957. Dep: 31/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28133 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/02/1958. Dep: 28/02/1958. | ||
24/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1959. Dep: 24/04/1959. | ||
03/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
07/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (14D) | ||
10/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/11/1959. Dep: 25/11/1959. | ||
17/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
24/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (14D) | ||
11/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1961. Dep: 09/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28154 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
10/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
26/06/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carstairs (66E) | ||
17/07/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61116 from Carstairs (66E) | ||
10/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |